Gardner v. River Walk Church of the Nazarene, The et al
Plaintiff: Jason Gardner
Defendant: River Walk Church of the Nazarene, The and Noreen Enterprises, LLC
Case Number: 1:2009cv02248
Filed: September 18, 2009
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Richard P. Matsch
Presiding Judge: Craig B. Shaffer
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER of DISMISSAL. Pursuant to the Stipulation for Dismissal, this civil action is dismissed without prejudice with each party to pay its own attorney fees and costs, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 10/12/10. (gmssl, )
February 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 24 COURTROOM MINUTES - Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer: Motion Hearing held on 2/9/2010. Uncontested Motion to Postpone Scheduling Conference and Deadlines, # 21 is GRANTED. Scheduling Conference set for 3/2 2/2010 at 02:15 PM in Courtroom A 402 before Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer. Proposed Scheduling Order due 3/15/2010. Confidential Settlement Statements due 3/15/2010. By Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer. (Court Reporter FTR - Linda Kahoe) (cbscd)
December 17, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 18 COURTROOM MINUTES - Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer: Status Conference held on 12/17/2009. ORDERED: Motion to Set Aside Entry of Default, doc # 13 , is GRANTED. Second Motion for Default Judgment, doc # 9 , is DENIED AS MOOT. Scheduling Conference set for 2/18/2010 11:00 AM in Courtroom A 402 before Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer. Proposed Scheduling Order is due 2/12/2010. (Court Reporter FTR - Linda Kahoe) (cbscd) Modified on 12/17/2009 to correct due date of proposed scheduling order (jjh, ).
December 8, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 11 COURTROOM MINUTES - Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer: Scheduling Conference held on 12/8/2009. ORDERED: The portion of Plaintiff's Motion for Default Judgment, doc # 5 , that seeks relief against the River Walk Church is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Counsel may file a new Motion for Entry of Default Judgment. (Court Reporter FTR- Linda Kahoe) (cbscd)
October 21, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER sua sponte resetting Scheduling Conference for 12/8/2009, at 10:45 a.m., in Courtroom A 402, by Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer on 10/21/09. (cbssec)
September 23, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER setting Scheduling Conference on 11/20/2009, at 10:00 a.m., in Courtroom A 402 before Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer, by Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer on 9/23/09. (cbssec)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gardner v. River Walk Church of the Nazarene, The et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jason Gardner
Represented By: Daniel Bruce Stageman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: River Walk Church of the Nazarene, The
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Noreen Enterprises, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?