Henderson et al v. Hartford Life & Accident Insurance Company et al
Plaintiff: Tammy Henderson, William Bomar and Travis Rode
Defendant: Hartford Life & Accident Insurance Company and Monumental Life Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2009cv02273
Filed: September 23, 2009
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Walker D. Miller
Presiding Judge: Kristen L. Mix
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Insurance Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER granting 31 Plaintiffs' Motion to Amend Complaint to Add a Claim for Exemplary Damages Pursuant to C.R.S. 13-21-102 and Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b)(3)(A). The Court accepts Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint and Jury Demand Adding Claim for Exemplary Damages [Docket No. 31 -3] for filing as of the date of this Order. Defendant shall answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint on or before 08/06/2010, by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 07/12/2010.(wjc, )
January 7, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER granting 24 Unopposed Motion for Partial Case Dismissal. All claims asserted against Defendant Monumental Life Insurance Company are hereby dismissed, with prejudice, each party to pay his, her or its own costs and attorneys fees herein expended, by Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 01/07/2010.(wjc, )
December 14, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 19 TRIAL PREPARATION ORDER-CIVIL: Final Pretrial Conference set for 2/15/2011 at 04:00 PM in Courtroom A 901 before Judge Marcia S. Krieger. Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 12/14/2009. (msksec, )
October 6, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER REGARDING CUSTODY OF EXHIBITS AND DEPOSITIONS USED IN EVIDENTIARY HEARINGS AND TRIALS: Any exhibits and depositions used during evidentiary hearings or trials, counsel for the parties shall retrieve the originals of such exhibits and deposition s from the Court following the evidentiary hearing or trial, and shall retain same for 60 days beyond the later of the time to appeal or conclusion of any appellate proceedings. The Court will retain its copy of the exhibits for the same time period after which the documents will be destroyed. by Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 10/6/09. (mskcd)
September 29, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER OF RECUSAL directing reassignment to another judge. By Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 09/29/2009. (sah, )
September 28, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER OF RECUSAL directing reassignment to another judge. By Judge Walker D. Miller on 09/28/2009. (sah, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Henderson et al v. Hartford Life & Accident Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tammy Henderson
Represented By: Durant D. Davidson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Bomar
Represented By: Durant D. Davidson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Travis Rode
Represented By: Durant D. Davidson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hartford Life & Accident Insurance Company
Represented By: Michael S. Beaver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Monumental Life Insurance Company
Represented By: James E. Gigax
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?