Miranda v. Astrue
Plaintiff: Rebecca Miranda
Defendant: Michael J. Astrue
Interested Party: SSA Noticing
Case Number: 1:2009cv02297
Filed: September 28, 2009
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: La Plata
Presiding Judge: John L. Kane
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405 Review of HHS Decision (DIWC)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 18, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER granting 24 Plaintiff's "Opposed Motion for Attorney Fees Pursuant to the Equal Access to Justice Act" and awarding $5,840.62 in fees to Plaintiff. By Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer on 11/18/2011. (cbslc1)
April 18, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER. Determination that plaintiff is not disabled is reversed and this matter is remanded for further proceedings consistent with this opinion, by Judge William J. Martinez on 4/18/11. (gmssl, )
February 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER. Joint Status Report due by 2/23/2011, by Judge William J. Martinez on 2/14/11. (gmssl, )
December 21, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Joint Case Management Plan for Social Security Cases (ORDER) SS Plaintiffs Brief due by 1/28/2010. SS Defendants Brief due by 3/12/2010. SS Plaintiffs Reply Brief due by 3/29/2010, by Judge John L. Kane on 12/21/09. (gms, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Miranda v. Astrue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rebecca Miranda
Represented By: Gail C. Harriss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael J. Astrue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SSA Noticing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?