Western Tradition Partnership et al v. City of Longmont, The et al
Plaintiff: Western Tradition Partnership, Longmont Association of Realtors, The, Julia Pirnack, Chris Rodriguez and Longmont Leadership Committee, The
Defendant: City of Longmont, The and Valeria Skitt
Case Number: 1:2009cv02303
Filed: September 28, 2009
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Arapahoe
Presiding Judge: Walker D. Miller
Presiding Judge: Michael J. Watanabe
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 29, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 43 NOTICE OF DISMISSAL pursuant to the 42 Joint Stipulated Motion to Dismiss with Prejudice in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1)(ii). The complaint is dismissed with prejudice, each party to pay his or its own costs and attorneys' fees, by Judge Walker D. Miller on 12/29/09.(ebs, )
December 21, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 41 MINUTE ORDER granting 39 Plaintiff's Motion to Stay Proceedings; Scheduling Conference set 12/22/2009 at 10:00 AM is vacated;Case is stayed until 1/11/2010. Parties shall file either Dismissal Papers or a written Status Report by 1/11/2010, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 12/21/2009.(mjwcd )
November 10, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER Scheduling Conference set for 12/22/2009 10:00 AM in Courtroom A 502 before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 11/10/09. (gms, )
October 21, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER granting in part to the extent expressed herein but otherwise denying 6 Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Defendants are enjoined, pending the outcome of these proceedings or further order from the Court, from regulating th e electioneering communications of Pirnack and WTP, unless those electioneering communications also simultaneously qualify as "independent expenditures." Defendants are further enjoined from requiring Rodriguez, LLC, and LAR, to include in the communication the total amount of the expenditure etc. as set forth in this Order. This injunction is binding upon the parties to this action, their officers, agents, etc. who receive actual notice of this order by personal service or otherwise, by Judge Walker D. Miller on 10/21/09.(ebs, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Western Tradition Partnership et al v. City of Longmont, The et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Western Tradition Partnership
Represented By: Scott Eric Gessler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Longmont Association of Realtors, The
Represented By: Scott Eric Gessler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Julia Pirnack
Represented By: Scott Eric Gessler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chris Rodriguez
Represented By: Scott Eric Gessler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Longmont Leadership Committee, The
Represented By: Scott Eric Gessler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Longmont, The
Represented By: Thomas J. Lyons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Valeria Skitt
Represented By: Thomas J. Lyons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?