Fusion Specialties, Inc. v. Banks
Plaintiff: Fusion Specialties, Inc.
Defendant: Teresa Banks
Case Number: 1:2009cv02310
Filed: September 29, 2009
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Broomfield
Presiding Judge: Robert E. Blackburn
Presiding Judge: Michael J. Watanabe
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 0101 (35:101 Patent Infringement)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 6, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER of DISMISSAL That the Stipulation For Dismissal With Prejudice 48 filed April 6, 2010, is APPROVED. Trial preparation conference and jury trial are vacated. This action is dismissed with prejudice with the parties to pay their own attorney fees and costs, by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 4/6/10. (jak, )
March 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 44 MINUTE ORDER granting 42 Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion to Amend Order of January 22, 2010 34 as set forth in the order, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 3/8/2010.(mjwcd)
February 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 39 MINUTE ORDER denying 35 Pro Se Defendant Banks' Motion to Amend Answer to Complaint, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 2/19/2010.(mjwcd )
January 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 34 COURTROOM MINUTES/MINUTE ORDER for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe: Status Conference held on 1/22/2010.Denying 31 Defendant's Motion Limited Defendant's Deposition Questions and Interrogatories to Personal Ju risdiction Issues Only. Defendant shall have to and including 2/5/2010 to respond to plaintiff's written discovery. Plaintiff shall have to and including 2/26/2010 to respond to the Motion to Dismiss 7 . The Court adopts the proposed schedule re: claim construction and the Scheduling Order 19 is thus amended. Settlement Conference set for 3/18/2010 10:00 AM in Courtroom A 502 before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe. (Court Reporter FTR - Ellen E. Miller) (mjwcd)
December 16, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 24 PROTECTIVE ORDER Entered by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 12/16/2009. (mjwcd )
December 4, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 15 TRIAL PREPARATION CONFERENCE ORDER by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 12/04/09. Trial Preparation Conference set for 10/15/2010 at 9:30 AM ; Jury Trial set for 11/1/2010 at 8:30 AM in Courtroom A1001 before Judge Robert E. Blackburn. (rebcd)
October 20, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER Scheduling Conference set for 12/4/2009 09:00 AM in Courtroom A 502 before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 10/20/2009. (mjwcd )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fusion Specialties, Inc. v. Banks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fusion Specialties, Inc.
Represented By: William D. Meyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teresa Banks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?