Cacioppo v. Town of Vail, Colorado et al
Plaintiff: Michael Cacioppo
Defendant: Town of Vail, Colorado, Darren Anderson and Luke J. Causey
Case Number: 1:2009cv02311
Filed: September 29, 2009
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Eagle
Presiding Judge: Richard P. Matsch
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 5, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 114 Final JUDGMENT by Clerk re 112 : judgment is entered in favor of defendant Darren Anderson and against plaintiff Michael Cacioppo, defendant Darren Anderson shall have his costs by the filing of a Bill of Costs with the Clerk of this Court within fourteen days of entry of judgment, and the Complaint, First Amended Complaint, Second Amended Complaint, and this civil action are dismissed, by Clerk on 3/5/2014. (rpmcd )
October 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 101 ORDER Setting Jury Trial for 3/3/2014 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom A and proposed voir dire and jury instructions directly to chambers on or before February 26, 2014, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 10/15/2013. (rpmcd)
September 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 98 ORDER Setting Pretrial Conference for 10/15/2013 at 02:00 PM in Conference Room, Proposed Pretrial Order due by 10/10/2013, in paper form directly to chambers by 4:00 p.m., and lead counsel present, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 9/3/2013. (rpmcd)
August 6, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 96 ORDER FOR STATUS REPORT On January 3, 2012, defendants counsel filed a Notice of Defendant Andersons Military Status. Defendant Anderson has filed nothing further and it is now ORDERED that Defendant Anderson shall file a status report on or before August 11, 2013, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 8/6/2013. (ervsl, )
January 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ORDER FOR ENTRY OF FINAL JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO FED.R.CIV.P. 54(b), re 83 Motion for Order. Clerk shall now enter final judgment pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 54(b) dismissing the Town of Vail, Colorado, and awarding costs to that defendant, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 1/13/2011.(rpmcd )
December 27, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER Setting Pretrial Conference for 1/30/2012 02:00 PM in Conference Room before Judge Richard P. Matsch. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 1/26/2012 by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 12/27/11. (jjh, )
December 13, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER for Summary Judgment Dismissing Town of Vail, Colorado by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 12/13/11. (jjh, )
November 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 54 Minute Entry - Courtroom Minutes for Motions Hearing held on 11/19/2010 before Judge Richard P. Matsch. ORDERED: Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint filed October 18, 2010 30 and 32 , is granted but not the proposed amended complaint attached (omit factual allegation in paragraph 32). Supplemental discovery permitted. Counsel to submit a revised proposed scheduling order. Defendant Anderson's Motion to Quash, filed October 5, 2010 26 , is denied. Nicolet ti to produce all records pursuant to the subpoena as instructed on record. Plaintiff's Motion for In Camera Inspection and Reclassification of Documents, filed October 18, 2010 29 and 31 , is granted. Unopposed Motion to Vacate Dispositive Motion Deadline, filed November2, 2010 40 , is granted. (FTR: K. Terasaki) (rpmcd)
July 29, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER Granting 24 Extending Discovery Cut-off and Dispositive Motion Deadlines re 12 . Discovery due by 10/25/2010. Dispositive Motions due by 11/8/2010, signed by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 7/29/2010.(rpmcd )
April 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER Granting 17 PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE FIRST AMENDEDCOMPLAINT, the first amended complaint tendered therewith is filed, removing Luke J. Causey as a defendant in this civil action and adding the Town of Vail, Colorado, as a defendant in the third claim for relief, signed by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 4/9/2010.(rpmcd)
February 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER Granting 15 Unopposed Motion to Modify 12 Scheduling Order. Deadline for filing a motion to amend to add the Town of Vail as a party is extended to and including March 24, 2010, signed by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 2/19/2010.(rpmcd)
February 5, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 14 SUPPLEMENTAL STIPULATION AND PROTECTIVE ORDER, signed by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 2/5/2010. (rpmcd)
December 17, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Stipulation and PROTECTIVE ORDER re: 9 , signed by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 12/17/2009. (rpmcd)
December 9, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER Dismissing Town of Vail, Colorado, and Denying Motion to Dismiss 3 by Defendant Causey by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 12/09/09.(jjh, )
November 4, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER Setting Scheduling Conference for 1/6/2010 at 10:00 AM in Conference Room and proposed order (original only) on paper, shall be submitted directlyto chambers by 4:00 p.m. on December 31, 2009, signed by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 11/4/2009. (rpmcd)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cacioppo v. Town of Vail, Colorado et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Cacioppo
Represented By: Brice A. Tondre
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Town of Vail, Colorado
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Darren Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Luke J. Causey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?