Zapien v. Home Depot U.S.A., Inc.
Plaintiff: Jesus Zapien
Defendant: Home Depot U.S.A., Inc.
Case Number: 1:2009cv02349
Filed: September 30, 2009
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Denver
Presiding Judge: Robert E. Blackburn
Presiding Judge: Boyd N. Boland
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER. Defendant Home Depot U.S.A., Inc.s Motion for Summary Judgment and Brief in Support Thereof 25 filed 06/09/2010, is GRANTED. Plaintiffs claims are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Judgment SHALL ENTER on behalf of defendant, Home Depot USA, Inc., and against plaintiff, Jesus Zapien, as to all claims for relief and causes of action asserted in this action. The Trial Preparation Conference, currently scheduled for 09/24/2010, at 9:00 a.m., as well as the trial, currently scheduled to commence on Monday, 10/11/2010, are VACATED. Defendant is AWARDED its costs, to be taxed by the Clerk of the Court pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 54(d)(1) and D.C.COLO.LCivR 54.1. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 09/02/2010.(sah, )
July 23, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 44 PROTECTIVE ORDER: by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 7/23/10. (bnbcd, )
July 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER : granting 30 Motion for Protective Order. The parties shall submit a proposed protective order on or before July 22, 2010, for my review ; granting in part and denying in part 33 Motion to Compel. The defendant shall make supplemental dis covery responses consistent with this order and produce all responsive documents on or before July 26, 2010, except with respect to Production Request No. 14, for which the defendant shall make a supplemental discovery response consistent with this o rder and produce all responsive documents as soon as they are available but in no event later than August 2, 2010. The plaintiffs response to Defendant Home Depot U.S.A., Inc.s Motion for Summary Judgment is due on or before July 30, 2010. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 8/11/2010. Final Pretrial Conference reset for 8/18/2010 01:00 PM in Courtroom A 401 before Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 7/19/10.(bnbcd, )
May 20, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER. Defendant Home Depot U.S.A., Inc.s Motion to Compel Discovery Responses and Motion for Sanctions 18 ois GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART.The plaintiff shall serve supplemental discovery responses consistent with this order and in full compliance with the formalities of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure on or before 05/31/2010. By Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 05/20/2010.(sah, )
December 1, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 13 TRIAL PREPARATION CONFERENCE ORDER by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 12/01/09. Trial Preparation Conference set for 9/24/2010 at 09:00 AM, four-day Jury Trial set for 10/11/2010 at 8:30 AM in Courtroom A1001 before Judge Robert E. Blackburn. (rebcd)
October 20, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 11/30/2009 09:30 AM in Courtroom A 401 before Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 10/20/09. (bnbcd, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Zapien v. Home Depot U.S.A., Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jesus Zapien
Represented By: Jeremy Richard Rosenthal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Home Depot U.S.A., Inc.
Represented By: Arthur Kittredge Smith, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?