Keyes v. Wilner et al
Plaintiff: Randy E. Keyes
Defendant: J. M. Wilner, Krick and J. Stucks
Case Number: 1:2009cv02380
Filed: October 6, 2009
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Fremont
Presiding Judge: Marcia S. Krieger
Presiding Judge: Boyd N. Boland
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Federal Question: Bivens Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 23, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 40 OPINION AND ORDER granting 38 Motion to Dismiss. The Defendants' 38 Motion to Dismiss is GRANTED, and all claims in this action are DISMISSED for the reasons stated forth herein. The Clerk of the Court shall close this case, by Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 03/23/2011.(wjc, )
December 3, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER to Dismiss In Part and to Draw Case to A District Judge and to a Magistrate Judge. Defendant J.M. Wilner is dismissed as a party to this action because no claims are asserted against him. This case shall be drawn to a district judge and to a magistrate judge. By Judge Zita L. Weinshienk on 12/03/2009. (sah, )
October 27, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER Directing Plaintiff to File Amended Complaint within 30 days by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 10/27/09. (jjh, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Keyes v. Wilner et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Randy E. Keyes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. M. Wilner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Krick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Stucks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?