Stein v. Zavaras et al
Petitioner: Michael D. Stein
Respondent: Aristedes W. Zavaras and John Suthers
Case Number: 1:2009cv02389
Filed: October 7, 2009
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Fremont
Presiding Judge: Boyd N. Boland
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 43 USCA ORDER re: 42 Letter. Denying authorization to file a second or successive habeas corpus application. (dbrow, )
August 17, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER Returning State Court Record granting 38 Motion for Order. The Clerk shall return the State Court Record, by Chief Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 8/17/12.(sgrim)
June 23, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER. Applicants pending motions [ECF No. 29, 30 and 33] are DENIED AS MOOT by Chief Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 06/23/11.(jjh, )
October 14, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER for State Court Record, that the Clerk of the Court for the District Court of Adams County, Colorado, as the lawful custodian of the records, shall forward the flat file and hearing transcripts for all proceedings in the trial court and in the appellate court in People v. Michael Stein, Adams County District Court, Case No. 04CR701, to the Clerk of the Court for the United States District Court for the District of Colorado, 901 Nineteenth Street, Room 105, Denver Colorado, 80294-3589, on o r before November 15, 2010. It is further ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court shall serve a copy of this Order on the Clerk of the Court for the Adams County District Court, by facsimile to (303)654-3216 and by regular mail to Clerk of the Court, Adams County District Court, 1100 Judicial Center Drive, Brighton, CO 80601. by Chief Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 10/14/2010. (erv, )
March 11, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER denying 18 Motion for Reconsideration of Order to Dismiss in Part and to Draw Case to a District Judge and Magistrate Judge by Chief Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 3/11/2010.(erv, )
February 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER to Dismiss in Part and to Draw Case to A District Judge and to a Magistrate Judge. Claims one, four, five, six and nine are dismissed for the reasons stated in this Order. Claims two, three, seven, eight and ten shall be drawn to a district judge and to a magistrate judge.By Judge Philip A. Brimmer for Judge Zita L. Weinshienk on 02/01/2010. (sah, )
December 16, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER Overruling Objection. Ordered that Applicant's "Objection to Minute Order and Clarification of Intent" 11 is overruled. Ordered that Applicant has 20 days to file a Reply to the Pre-Answer Response by Judge Zita L. Weinshienk on 12/16/09. (jjh, )
November 13, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Minute ORDER denying 8 Motion for Order to Provide Documents Without Costs. Order granting 9 Motion for Extension of Time. Applicant shall have up to and including 12/14/09 to file his Reply to the Pre-Answer Response by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 11/13/09.(jjh, )
October 14, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER to File Pre-Answer Response. Ordered that within 20 days Respondents shall file a Pre-Answer Response. Ordered that within 20 days of the filing of the Pre-Answer Response Applicant may file a Reply by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 10/14/09. (jjh, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stein v. Zavaras et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Michael D. Stein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Aristedes W. Zavaras
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: John Suthers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?