Gray v. Nextel West Corp.
Plaintiff: Akili Gray
Defendant: Nextel West Corp.
Case Number: 1:2009cv02390
Filed: October 7, 2009
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Arapahoe
Presiding Judge: Michael E. Hegarty
Presiding Judge: Marcia S. Krieger
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 12101 Americans With Disabilities Act (ADA)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 6, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 26 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 1/6/2010. (mehcd)
December 15, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 22 MINUTE ORDER denying as duplicative 15 Stipulated Motion for Entry of Protective Order; denying without prejudice 17 Stipulated Motion for Entry of Protective Order, and the proposed Stipulated Protective Order is refused, by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 12/15/2009.(wjc, )
November 17, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting 9 Stipulated Motion Regarding Correct Defendant and Dismissal of Rehabilitation Act Claim. Nextel West Corp. is dismissed, with prejudice, as a Defendant, and Sprint/United Management Company is substituted as the proper Defendant. Any Rehabilitation Act claim asserted by Plaintiff is dismissed with prejudice. Each party shall pay its own costs and fees as they pertain to these two issues. All future captions shall so reflect, by Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 11/17/2009.(wjc, )
October 26, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER REGARDING CUSTODY OF EXHIBITS AND DEPOSITIONS USED IN EVIDENTIARY HEARINGS AND TRIALS: Any exhibits and depositions used during evidentiary hearings or trials, counsel for the parties shall retrieve the originals of such exhibits and deposition s from the Court following the evidentiary hearing or trial, and shall retain same for 60 days beyond the later of the time to appeal or conclusion of any appellate proceedings. The Court will retain its copy of the exhibits for the same time period after which the documents will be destroyed. by Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 10/26/09. (mskcd)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gray v. Nextel West Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Akili Gray
Represented By: Kevin C. Flesch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nextel West Corp.
Represented By: Janet Ann Savage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?