Deal v. Unum Life Insurance Company of America
Plaintiff: Sandy Deal
Defendant: Unum Life Insurance Company of America
Case Number: 1:2009cv02426
Filed: October 13, 2009
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Arapahoe
Presiding Judge: Christine M. Arguello
Presiding Judge: Michael J. Watanabe
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 1001 E.R.I.S.A.: Employee Retirement
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 29, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER DISMISSING CASE WITH PREJUDICE, each party to pay its own attorneys fees and costs. by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 1/29/2010. (erv, )
January 11, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting 14 Defendant's Motion for Leave to Allow Party Representative to Appear By Telephone. by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 1/11/2010.(mjwcd )
October 20, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER Scheduling Conference set for 12/11/2009 08:30 AM in Courtroom A 502 before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 10/20/2009. (mjwcd )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Deal v. Unum Life Insurance Company of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sandy Deal
Represented By: John J. Astuno, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unum Life Insurance Company of America
Represented By: Steven T. Collis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?