Nagim v. Equifax Information Services, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Ronald J. Nagim
Defendant: Equifax Information Services, LLC and Experian Information Solutions, Inc.
Garnishee: TransUnion, LLC
Case Number: 1:2009cv02428
Filed: October 14, 2009
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Arapahoe
Presiding Judge: Philip A. Brimmer
Presiding Judge: Kristen L. Mix
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1681 Fair Credit Reporting Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 29, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 140 ORDER denying plaintiff's 139 Motion to Show Cause. By Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 5/29/12.(mnfsl, )
April 26, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 138 ORDER. Plaintiff's 122 Motion to Object and 135 Motion to Show Cause are denied. By Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 4/26/12.(mnfsl, )
November 28, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 134 ORDER denying 129 Equifax's Motion for Costs. By Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 11/28/2011.(jjpsl, )
October 11, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 120 ORDER. Defendant Trans Union, LLC's 114 Motion for Costs is granted. The Clerk of the Court shall review defendant Trans Union, LLC's proposed bill of costs, see Docket No. 113 ; see also Docket No. 114 -1, and tax costs against plaintiff as appropriate pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1920. By Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 10/11/11.(mnfsl, )
May 20, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 109 ORDER to Cure Deficiency re 107 Notice of Appeal by Ronald Nagim, appellant has 30 days to either pay the filing fee or file a 1915 motion with district court by Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 05/20/11. (bjrsl, )
May 9, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 105 ORDER. The 99 Recommendation of United States Magistrate Judge is accepted. Defendants' 74 , 77 , 78 motions for summary judgment are granted. Plaintiff's 100 Motion for Hearing and 102 Motion to Show Cause are denied. Judgment shall enter in favor of defendants and against plaintiff. By Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 5/9/11.(mnfsl, )
August 20, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 71 MINUTE ORDER denying 69 Defendant Trans Union LLC's Motion for Leave to File a Brief in Excess of Twenty Pages, by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 8/20/10.(ebs, )
June 7, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 63 PROTECTIVE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 6/7/2010. (klmcd)
February 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 54 MINUTE ORDER granting 23 Plaintiff's Motion for Removal of Default Judgment. Striking 17 Plaintiff's Motion for Default Judgment, by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 2/19/10.(ebs, )
February 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER denying 45 and 47 Plaintiffs' Motions for Cerdit (sic) Expert Request by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 2/9/2010.(klmcd)
February 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER granting 32 Plaintiff's Motion to Amend Lawsuit Due to Corrections. The Court accepts Plaintiff's Amended Complaint [Docket no. 32-2] for filing as of the date of this Order, by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 2/1/10.(ebs, )
December 9, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 35 MINUTE ORDER granting 33 Equifax Information Services LLC's Unopposed Motion for Leave to Allow Lead Counsel to Participate Telephonically in Scheduling Conference, by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 12/9/09.(ebs, )
December 8, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 30 MINUTE ORDER granting 26 Defendant Trans Union LLCs Unopposed Motion for Leave to Attend Rule 16(B) Scheduling/Planning Conference Via Telephone. Counsel for Defendant Trans Union LLC shall appear by telephone at the Scheduling Conference set for December 15, 2009 at 11:00 a.m. At the date and time of the conference, counsel shall contact chambers at (303) 335-2770. by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 12/8/2009.(klmcd)
December 3, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 25 MINUTE ORDER granting 14 Defendant Experian Information Solutions, Inc.'s Motion for Leave to Appear at Rule 16 Scheduling Conference Via Telephone, by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 12/3/09.(ebs, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nagim v. Equifax Information Services, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald J. Nagim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equifax Information Services, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Garnishee: TransUnion, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?