Chevron U.S.A. Inc. v. Timm et al
Plaintiff: Chevron U.S.A. Inc.
Defendant: Gregory D. Timm, Cary L. Carpenter and Allen Van Wyhe
Case Number: 1:2009cv02429
Filed: October 14, 2009
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Walker D. Miller
Presiding Judge: Michael J. Watanabe
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Contract Dispute
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 112 ORDER. The Motion of Chevron U.S.A. Inc. and Chevron TCI, Inc. for Entry of Judgment 108 , filed 10/15/2010, is GRANTED. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 11/15/2010.(sah, )
October 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 106 MINUTE ORDER. Pro Se Defendant Gregory D. Timms Request to Vacate Contempt Hearing 104 is DENIED. However, the court will allow Mr. Timm to participate at the Show Cause Hearing on 10/14/2010 at 9:00 a.m. by telephone. By Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 10/12/2010.(sah, )
October 6, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 103 ORDER. The Motion for Summary Judgment of Chevron U.S.A. Inc. and ChevronTCI, Inc. 65 filed 07/30/2010, is GRANTED. By Friday, 10/15/2010 plaintiff, Chevron U.S.A., Inc., is DIRECTED to file with the court a motion for entry of judgment. The count erclaims asserted against plaintiff, Chevron U.S.A., Inc., as well as the third-party claims asserted against the third-party defendant, Chevron TCI, Inc., by defendant, Gregory D. Timm, are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. The Motion of Chevron U.S.A. Inc . To Enforce Waiver of Jury Trial and Certification of Compliance With D.C.COLO.LCivR 7.1 95 is DENIED as moot. The Trial Preparation Conference, currently scheduled for 10/08/2010, at 9:30 a.m., as well as the trial, currently scheduled to commence on 10/25/2010, are VACATED. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 10/06/2010.(sah, )
September 14, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 94 MINUTE ORDER. Defendant Timms Second Motion To Compel Production of Documents, Motion For Enlargement of Time and Motion For Continuance of Jury Trial 80 filed 08/21/2010 is DENIED, insofar as it seeks to continue the trial. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 09/14/2010.(sah, )
August 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 71 MINUTE ORDER. Defendants Motion To Compel Production of Documents, Motion For Enlargement of Time and Motion For Continuance of Jury Trial 67 filed 08/04/2010, that requests a continuance of the jury trial, is DENIED. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 08/19/2010.(sah, )
August 18, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 70 MINUTE ORDER. Pro Se Defendant Timms Motion to Compel Production of Documents, Motion for Enlargement of Time and Motion for Continuance of Trial 67 is DENIED IN PART and this court DECLINES TO RULE IN PART. The portion of the Subject Motion seeking an Enlargement of Time is DENIED. By Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 08/18/2010.(sah, )
May 13, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 64 MINUTE ORDER denying 60 11500 Lessee, LLCs Request for Reconsideration ofOrder Denying Motion to Intervene as Third Party Plaintiff. By Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 05/12/2010.(sah, )
March 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 58 MINUTE ORDER denying 55 11500 Lessee, LLC's Motion to Intervene as Third Party Plaintiff, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 3/15/2010.(mjwcd)
January 7, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 47 MINUTE ORDER granting 46 Defendant Gregory D. Timm's Request (Motion) for Reconsideration of Order Denying Request to Appear Telephonically at Scheduling Conference; Defendant Timm's 40 Motion to Appear Telephonically at Scheduling Conference is now granted; Defendant Timm shall appear by telephone for the 1/11/2010 08:30 AM scheduling conference, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 1/7/2010.(mjwcd )
January 4, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 38 PROTECTIVE ORDER. By Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 01/04/2010. (sah, )
December 16, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER granting 21 Plaintiff Chevron's Motion for Substituted Service on Defendant Gregory Timm, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 12/16/2009. (mjwcd )
October 20, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER Scheduling Conference set for 12/16/2009 09:30 AM in Courtroom A 502 before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 10/20/2009. (mjwcd )
October 15, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER OF RECUSAL directing reassignment to another judge. By Senior District Judge Walker D. Miller on 10/15/2009. (sah, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chevron U.S.A. Inc. v. Timm et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chevron U.S.A. Inc.
Represented By: Rachel Ann Yates
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gregory D. Timm
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cary L. Carpenter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allen Van Wyhe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?