Sandoz Inc. v. Pfizer, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Sandoz Inc.
Defendant: Pfizer, Inc., Pfizer Ireland Pharmaceuticals, C.P. Pharmaceuticals International C.V., Warner-Lambert Company and Warner-Lambert Company LLC
Case Number: 1:2009cv02457
Filed: October 16, 2009
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Boulder
Presiding Judge: Walker D. Miller
Presiding Judge: Michael J. Watanabe
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 35:0001 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 13 Defendants Motion to Transfer or Stay this action to the extent it seeks a transfer to the District of Delaware and DENIED to the extent that it seeks a stay, as the stay request is now moot. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT this action be transferred to the District of Delaware for further prosecution and adjudication. by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 2/8/2010.(erv, ) (Modified on 2/9/2010 edited duplicate text)(erv, ).
December 14, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER Scheduling Conference set for 2/4/2010 09:30 AM in Courtroom A 502 before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 12/14/2009. (mjwcd )
November 12, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting 9 Joint Stipulation to Strike Sandoz Jury Demand and Request for a Nonjury Trial. The jury demand made by Plaintiff Sandoz Inc. in its Complaint for Declaratory Relief 1 , is STRICKEN WITHOUT PREJUDICE, to renew should a new issue triable by jury be added to the case. by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 11/12/09.(erv, )
November 5, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER Reassigning Magistrate Judge. The Clerk of the Court shall reassign this case from the Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty to Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe. All future filings in this action shall be docketed under Civil Action No. 09-cv-02457-CMA-MJW. By Judge Christine M. Arguello on 11/05/2009. (sah, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sandoz Inc. v. Pfizer, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sandoz Inc.
Represented By: David C. Doyle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pfizer, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pfizer Ireland Pharmaceuticals
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C.P. Pharmaceuticals International C.V.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warner-Lambert Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warner-Lambert Company LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?