Warr v. Zavaras et al
Plaintiff: Joseph Warr
Defendant: Aristedes W. Zavaras, Scruggs, Gonzalez, Paula Frantz and Richard Boldridge
Case Number: 1:2009cv02477
Filed: October 22, 2009
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Crowley
Presiding Judge: Maryland Unassigned
Presiding Judge: Kristen L. Mix
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 12, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER ACCEPTED 75 Report and Recommendations of the United States Magistrate Judge. Granting 65 Defendants Motion for Summary Judgment; The Clerk shall enter judgment for Defendants on all claims, with all parties to bear their own attorneys fees and costs. by Judge William J. Martinez on 12/12/2011.(ervsl, )
April 29, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER APPROVED 39 Report and Recommendations of the United States Magistrate Judge; granting in part and denying in part 24 Defendants Motion to Dismiss; Claims II and III are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE because they are barred by the applicable statute of limitations. Claim I is not dismissed. It survives Defendants Motion to Dismiss and is Plaintiffs lone claim remaining in this case. by Judge William J. Martinez on 4/29/2011.(erv, )
February 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER. Joint Status Report due by 2/23/2011, by Judge William J. Martinez on 2/14/11. (gmssl, )
January 11, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER GRANTING SERVICE BY UNITED STATES MARSHAL, by Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 1/8/10. (ebs, )
January 7, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER Drawing Case. This case shall be drawn to a district judge and to a magistrate judge. By Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 01/07/2010. (sah, )
November 30, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER Directing Plaintiff to File Amended Complaint within 30 days by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 11/30/09. (jjh, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Warr v. Zavaras et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Warr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aristedes W. Zavaras
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scruggs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paula Frantz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Boldridge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?