Houston v. No Defendants Named
Plaintiff: Eric Houston
Defendant: No Defendants Named
Case Number: 1:2009cv02480
Filed: October 22, 2009
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Fremont
Presiding Judge: Boyd N. Boland
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Federal Question: Bivens Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 51 Minute ORDER Plaintiffs motions filed on March 23 and 29, 2010, will not be considered and are DENIED because Plaintiff filed a notice of appeal on March 4, 2010. Therefore, the Court lacks jurisdiction to consider the March 23 and 29 motions by Judge Zita L. Weinshienk on 04/01/10.(jjh, )
March 10, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER to Cure Deficiency re 39 Notice of Appeal by Eric Houston, by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 03/10/10. Appellant has 30 days to either pay the filing fee or file a proper 1915 motion with district court.(bjrsl, )
February 23, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER of Dismissal. Ordered that the complaint, the amended complaints, and the action are dismissed without prejudice for failure to cure all the deficiencies designated in the 10/22/09, Order to cure. Ordered that any pending motions are denied as moot by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 02/23/10.(jjh, )
January 29, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER to Strike. Ordered that the document that Plaintiff, Eric Houston, submitted to and filed with the Court on 01/27/10, is stricken pursuant to Rule 12(f) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Ordered that the Mr. Houston is cautioned that any such documents he submits to the Court in the future will justify the dismissals of the instant action by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 01/29/10. (jjh, )
January 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 22 Second ORDER Directing Warden to Respond to Order to Show Cause. Ordered that the Warden of the United States Penitentiary in Florence Colorado respond as directed within 15 days to the order to show cause. Ordered that the clerk of the Court mail to the warden a copy of this Order and copy of the Order to Show Cause. Ordered that the clerk of the Court mail a copy of this order to Warden, United States Penitentiary, P.O. Box 7000, Florence CO, 81226-7000 and to Warden, United States Penitentiary, P.O. Box 7500, Florence CO, 81226-7500 by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 01/22/10. (jjh, )
October 22, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER Directing Clerk to Commence Civil Action and Directing Plaintiff to Cure Deficiency. Plaintiff shall have 30 days to file a completed complaint and 1915 motion, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 10/19/09. (jak, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Houston v. No Defendants Named
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eric Houston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: No Defendants Named
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?