Freeman v. No Respondents Named
Petitioner: Marcus L. Freeman
Respondent: No Respondents Named
Case Number: 1:2009cv02493
Filed: October 23, 2009
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Fremont
Presiding Judge: Boyd N. Boland
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2241 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (federa
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 12, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER to Cure Deficiency re 66 Notice of Appeal by Marcus Freeman, appellant has 30 days to either pay the filing fee or file a 1915 motion with district court by Judge David M. Ebel on 01/12/11. (bjrsl, )
December 7, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER granting 60 Petitioner's Motion for Reconsideration re 56 Order on Motion for Leave to Appeal in Forma Pauperis. Petitioner to file properly completed Prisoners Motion and Affidavit for Leave to Proceed on Appeal pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915 and Fed. R. App. P. 24 in a Habeas Corpus Action within 10 days of the date of this Order, by Judge David M. Ebel on 12/7/10.(mnf, )
October 26, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER. Petitioner Marcus Freemans motion seeking reconsideration of this Courts order denying his motion to proceed on appeal in forma pauperis 57 is DENIED. By Judge David M. Ebel on 10/26/2010.(sah, )
August 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER. Petitioners Motion for Reconsideration 40 is DENIED. By Judge David M. Ebel on 08/19/2010.(sah, )
August 4, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER to Cure Deficiency re 42 Notice of Appeal by Marcus Freeman, by Judge David M. Ebel on 08/04/10. Appellant has 30 days to either pay the filing fee or file a 1915 motion with district court.(bjrsl, )
July 26, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER. The Recommendation of the United States Magistrate Judge 30 is ADOPTED and orders that Petitioners Application for a Writ of Habeas Corpus Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 2241 be DENIED. Petitioners Motion for Discovery is also DENIED. Petitioners action is thus DISMISSED with prejudice, and judgment shall be entered accordingly. By Judge David M. Ebel on 07/26/2010.(sah, )
April 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 31 MINUTE ORDER denying 27 petitioner's (letter docketed as a) Motion for an Investigation, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 4/19/2010.(mjwcd)
January 26, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER Drawing Case. This case shall be drawn to a district judge and to a magistrate judge. By Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 01/26/2010. (sah, )
December 1, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Minute ORDER denying as premature 9 Motion for Discovery by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 12/01/09.(jjh, )
October 23, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 1 ORDER Directing Clerk to Commence Civil Action and Directing Applicant to Cure Deficiency. Applicant shall have 30 days to file a petition and 1915 motion on the proper court forms, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 10/19/09. (jak, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Freeman v. No Respondents Named
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Marcus L. Freeman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: No Respondents Named
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?