May 12, 2011 |
Filing
157
MINUTE ORDER denying as moot 155 Plaintiff's Motion for Transcript, by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 5/12/2011. (mehcd)
|
March 22, 2011 |
Filing
143
MINUTE ORDER. Plaintiffs Motion For Reconsideration 116 filed 11/26/2010;(2) Plaintiffs Motion For Reconsideration 125 filed 1/19/2011;(3) Plaintiffs Petition For a Writ of Habeas Corpus Ad Testificandum 136 filed 3/15/2011; and (4) Plaintiffs Motion For Subpoena 137 filed 3/16/2011 are DENIED AS MOOT. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 3/22/2011.(sah, )
|
February 14, 2011 |
Filing
131
ORDER. The plaintiffs Motion for Leave To File Amended Complaint 61 filed 7/16/2010, is DENIED as moot. the Recommendation on Second Motion To Amend 79 filed 9/8/2010, is TERMINATED on the docket as moot. the plaintiffs Motion for Reconsideratio n 87 filed 9/20/2010, is DENIED as moot. The Recommendation on Motion for Reconsideration 92 filed 9/27/2010, is TERMINATED on the docket as moot. The plaintiffs Motion for Order on Recommendation 117 filed 11/26/2010, is DENIED as moot. The Motion for Order on Recommendation on Motion for Reconsideration 118 filed 11/30/2010, is DENIED as moot. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 2/14/2011.(sah, )
|
November 22, 2010 |
Filing
115
MINUTE ORDER granting 112 Defendants' Motion to Withdraw Motion for Summary Judgment. 76 Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment is withdrawn. By Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 11/22/2010. (mehcd)
|
November 18, 2010 |
Filing
109
AMENDED SECOND TRIAL PREPARATION CONFERENCE ORDER. The Trial Preparation Conference is amended to reflect the correct defendant in this matter,pursuant to the courts Order Adopting Recommendation of The United States Magistrate Judge 105 entered 11/15/2010, and accepting the First Amended Prisoner Complaint Consistent With Order 99 filed 10/12/2010. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 11/18/2010. (sah, )
|
November 5, 2010 |
Filing
105
ORDER. The Recommendation To Modify Case and Trial Schedule 102 filed10/10/2010, is APPROVED AND ADOPTED. The First Amended Prisoner Complaint Consistent With Order 99 filed 10/12/2010, is ACCEPTED. The defendants SHALL FILE a response to the am ended complaint 99 on or before 11/19/2010. The dispositive motions deadline is EXTENDED to 12/06/2010. The Trial Preparation Conference scheduled for 12/03/2010 and the Jury Trial scheduled for 12/13/2010, are VACATED and CONTINUED. On 11/17/20 10, at 10:00 a.m., the court shall conduct a telephonic setting conference to reset the Trial Preparation Conference and jury trial in this matter. The Defendants Motion for Extension of Time To File Jury Instructions 104 filed 11/03/2010, is DENIED as moot. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 11/05/2010. by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 11/05/2010.(sah, )
|
October 18, 2010 |
Filing
102
RECOMMENDATION to Modify Case and Trial Schedule, by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 10/18/2010. (mehcd)
|
September 13, 2010 |
Filing
83
MINUTE ORDER denying 80 Plaintiff's Motion for Reconsideration, by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 9/13/2010. (mehcd)
|
September 1, 2010 |
Filing
78
MINUTE ORDER denying 74 Plaintiff's Motion for Class Certification, by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 9/1/2010. (mehcd)
|
July 20, 2010 |
Filing
68
MINUTE ORDER granting 63 Defendants' Second Motion for Extension of Time to File Dispositive Motions. Dispositive Motions due by 8/31/2010; granting in part and denying in part 65 Defendants' Motion to Vacate the Final Pretrial Conference. Final Pretrial Conference set for 8/19/2010 is reset for 10/18/2010 at 9:30 AM in Courtroom C203 before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. By Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 7/20/2010. (mehcd)
|
April 16, 2010 |
Filing
38
MINUTE ORDER denying without prejudice 36 Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint, by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 4/16/2010. (mehcd)
|
February 25, 2010 |
Filing
29
MINUTE ORDER. Plaintiffs First Request For Admissions Directed to Defendant Chris Barr 28 filed 02/24/2010, is STRICKEN. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 02/25/2010.(sah, )
|
February 16, 2010 |
Filing
23
TRIAL PREPARATION CONFERENCE ORDER by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 2/16/10. Trial Preparation Conference set for 12/3/2010 at 10:00 AM ; three-day Jury Trial set for 12/13/2010 commencing at 8:30 AM in Courtroom A1001 before Judge Robert E. Blackburn. (rebcd)
|
December 1, 2009 |
Filing
9
ORDER denying 8 plaintiffs Motion To Reconsider District Judges (sic) Decision on Dismissal of Claim. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 12/01/2009.(sah, )
|
November 24, 2009 |
Filing
4
ORDER Requiring Service By United States Marshal. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 11/23/2009. (sah, )
|
November 20, 2009 |
Filing
2
ORDER to Dismiss In Part and to Assign In Part. The Fifth and Fourteenth Amendment claims based on Plaintiff's loss of personal property are dismissed as legally frivolous pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915A(b)(1). This case shall be assigned to District Judge Robert E. Blackburn, pursuant to D.C.COLO.L.CivR 40.1C.1., and to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. By Judge Zita L. Weinshienk on 11/20/2009. (sah, )
|