Principal Life Insurance Company v. Mitchell et al
Plaintiff: Principal Life Insurance Company
Defendant: Wendy Mitchell and Charles H. Adams, IV
Case Number: 1:2009cv02501
Filed: October 23, 2009
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Philip A. Brimmer
Presiding Judge: Craig B. Shaffer
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Insurance Contract
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 26, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 94 ORDER. The 61 Motion to Compel, with all its subparts, is denied without prejudice, by Magistrate Judge Gudrun J. Rice on 1/26/11.(mnf, )
December 29, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 89 ORDER Re: 61 MOTION to Compel and Setting of Evidentiary Hearing. The ruling is deferred on the Motion to Compel and the matter is set for an Evidentiary Hearing on 1/25/2011 at 1:00 PM. Discovery continues to be stayed until further Order of Court, by Magistrate Judge Gudrun J. Rice on 12/29/10. (mnf, )
November 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER granting 77 Defendant Charles H. Adams IV's Motion to Strike Defendant Mitchell's Notice of Court filing by Defendant Mitchell in Montrose District Court. The Court denies without prejudice the request for an award of attorney fees, by Magistrate Judge Gudrun J. Rice on 11/19/10.(ebs, )
November 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 82 AMENDED ORDER (to correct typographical error on page 2) re: 81 Order on Motion to Stay. 58 Granting Plaintiff's MOTION to Stay Discovery. All discovery is stayed pending ruling on motions, as set forth in the order, by Magistrate Judge Gudrun J. Rice on 11/1/10. (gmssl, )
October 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER granting 66 Plaintiff's Motion to Vacate Preliminary Pretrial Conference; and Alternative Motion to Participate by Telephone. Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 10/13/10 at 10:00 a.m. is vacated, by Magistrate Judge Gudrun J. Rice on 10/19/10.(ebs, )
April 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER granting 43 Unopposed Motion for Leave to Participate in Scheduling/Settlement Conference by Telephone. Plaintiff Principal Life Insurance Company will call the court on Monday, 4/19/10 at 10:00 AM at 970-241-2187, by Magistrate Judge Laird T. Milburn on 4/12/10.(ebs, )
February 23, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 4/19/2010 10:00 AM in Room 323 (Grand Junction) before Magistrate Judge Laird T. Milburn, by Magistrate Judge Laird T. Milburn on 2/23/10. (jaksl, )
January 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 20 AMENDED ORDER OF REFERENCE to Magistrate Craig B. Shaffer by Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 1/8/10. (pabcd)
October 27, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER setting Scheduling Conference on 12/21/2009, at 10:00 a.m., in Courtroom A 402, by Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer on 10/27/09. (cbssec)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Principal Life Insurance Company v. Mitchell et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Principal Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Marie Elizabeth Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wendy Mitchell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles H. Adams, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?