Suazo v. Continental Casualty Company et al
Plaintiff: Elizabeth Suazo
Defendant: Continental Casualty Company and First Data Corporation Group Disability Plan
Case Number: 1:2009cv02531
Filed: October 27, 2009
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Denver
Presiding Judge: Richard P. Matsch
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 1132 E.R.I.S.A.-Employee Benefits
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 30, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER for Dismissal With Prejudice. Each party to bear their own legal fees and costs by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 06/30/10. (jjh, )
May 6, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 21 Minute ORDER granting 19 Motion to Vacate Settlement Conference. The Settlement Conference set for 05/14/10 is VACATED. All counsel shall contact the court (by one joint conference call) by 05/21/10 to reset this matter by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 05/06/10.(jjh, )
March 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 18 MINUTE ORDER granting 16 Hartford's Unopposed Motion for Leave to Participate by Telephone in Settlement Conference. Ms. Dixon is permitted to participate telephonically, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 3/9/2010.(mjwcd) Modified on 3/9/2010 to correct spelling error (jjh, ).
January 25, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER Vacating Scheduling Conference. ORDERED that the scheduling conference set for February 11, 2010, and the deadline for submitting a proposed scheduling order are vacated by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 01/25/10. (jjh, )
December 9, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER Setting Scheduling Conference for 2/11/2010 at 10:30 AM in Conference Room and proposed order (original only) on paper, shall be submitted directly to chambers by 4:00 p.m. on February 4, 2010, signed by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 12/9/2009. (rpmcd)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Suazo v. Continental Casualty Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elizabeth Suazo
Represented By: Shawn E. McDermott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Continental Casualty Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: First Data Corporation Group Disability Plan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?