Holland v. Johnson et al
Plaintiff: Stephen J. Holland
Defendant: Rodney (I) Johnson, Rodney Johnson, Walter (I) P. Eldridge and Walter P. Eldridge
Case Number: 1:2009cv02550
Filed: October 29, 2009
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Grand
Presiding Judge: Richard P. Matsch
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 8, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 46 Stipulation and ORDER Regarding Custody of Exhibits and Depositions, signed by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 4/8/2011 (Exhibits and depositions returned to counsel). (rpmcd)
March 11, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER On Defendants' 24 Motion for Summary Judgment, is denied excepting as to the claim for a violation of substantive due process protection, signed by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 3/11/2011.(rpmcd)
November 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER Setting Jury Trial for 4/4/2011 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom A and Proposed Pretrial Order due by 4:00 p.m. 3/4/2011, signed by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 11/19/2010. (rpmcd )
September 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER For Calendar Call set 11/19/2010 08:30 AM in Courtroom A before Judge Richard P. Matsch with Counsel to provide a joint statement when the case is called, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 09/09/10. (jjh, )
December 10, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER Setting Scheduling Conference for 2/11/2010 at 11:00 AM in Conference Room and proposed order (original only) on paper, shall be submitted directly to chambers by 4:00 p.m. on February 4, 2010, signed by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 12/10/2009. (rpmcd)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Holland v. Johnson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephen J. Holland
Represented By: Michael L. Glaser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rodney (I) Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rodney Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walter (I) P. Eldridge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walter P. Eldridge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?