Morrison v. Long Building Technologies, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Scott Morrison
Defendant: Long Building Technologies, Inc. and United of Omaha Life Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2009cv02551
Filed: October 29, 2009
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Jefferson
Presiding Judge: Wiley Y. Daniel
Presiding Judge: Michael J. Watanabe
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 29:1001 E.R.I.S.A.: Employee Retirement
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 30, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER. ORDERED that this action is hereby DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE, each party shall bear his or its own costs and attorneys fees. ORDERED that Plaintiff's Motion for Attorney Fees and Costs 61 , is DENIED AS MOOT by Chief Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 08/30/11.(jjh, )
July 28, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 63 MINUTE ORDER granting 62 Motion to Substitute Exhibit by Chief Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 07/28/11.(jjh, )
November 4, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 58 MINUTE ORDER granting 57 Motion for Leave to File Surreply to Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment. Defendants Surreply to Plaintiff's 38 Motion for Summary Judgment by Defendant United of Omaha Life Insurance Company due 11/15/2010 and shall not exceed five (5) pages. Entered by Chief Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 11/4/10. (wydcd, rrk)
September 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 42 MINUTE ORDER granting 41 Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Leave to Exceed Page Limit in Response to Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment. Defendant is hereby permitted to file a thirty-page response brief, not including the parties' statement of facts. by Chief Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 9/9/2010.(erv, )
June 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 34 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER entered by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 6/2/2010. (mjwcd)
January 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 3/11/2010 09:00 AM in Courtroom A 502 before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 1/15/2010. (mjwcd )
January 4, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER OF RECUSAL directing reassignment to another judge. By Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 01/04/2010. (sah, )
December 21, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER of Dismissal of Defendant Long Building Technologies, Inc. Without Prejudice. Ordered that the Motion to Dismiss 2 is granted. Ordere all claims asserted in this matter against defendant defendant Long Building Technologies, Inc. are dismissed without prejudice, with each party to bear its own attorneys fees and costs by Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 12/21/09.(jjh, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Morrison v. Long Building Technologies, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scott Morrison
Represented By: Michael Scott Krieger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Long Building Technologies, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United of Omaha Life Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?