Tyler v. Jones et al
Plaintiff: Terry Tyler
Defendant: A W.J. Jones, Chris and Derr
Case Number: 1:2009cv02561
Filed: October 31, 2009
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Boyd N. Boland
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Federal Question: Bivens Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 1, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER. Plaintiffs pleading titled Writ of Habeas Corpus Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 2241 77 is DENIED. The Clerk of Court is directed not to accept anyfuture pleadings from Plaintiff for filing in this lawsuit. By Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 3/1/2011.(sah, )
February 26, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER denying without prejudice 36 Plaintiffs Motion of Statement to be Placed in the Record by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 2/26/2010.(klmcd)
February 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 27 MINUTE ORDER denying without prejudice 24 Plaintiffs Motion of Special Notice to the Court by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 2/9/2010.(klmcd)
February 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER DRAWING CASE. This case shall be drawn to a district judge and to a magistrate judge. By Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 02/01/2010. (sah, )
January 7, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER Allowing Plaintiff to Proceed Without Payment of Initial Partial Filing Fee by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 01/07/10. (jjh, )
October 30, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER Directing Clerk to Commence Civil Action and Directing Plaintiff to Cure Deficiencies. Plaintiff shall have 30 days to file a certified copy of prisoner's trust fund statement, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 10/27/09. (jak, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tyler v. Jones et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terry Tyler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A W.J. Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Derr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?