Flahiff v. Cooper et al
Plaintiff: Jared Flahiff
Defendant: Cooper, Hassenfritz and Hoyt Brill
Case Number: 1:2009cv02593
Filed: November 4, 2009
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Kit Carson
Presiding Judge: Boyd N. Boland
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 5, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER of Dismissal. Ordered that the Prisoner Complaint and the action are dismissed as legally frivolous by Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 04/05/10 for Zita Lesson Weinshienk(jjh, )
February 16, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Second ORDER Directing Plaintiff to File Amended Complaint within 30 days by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 02/16/10. (jjh, )
January 7, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER Directing Plaintiff to File Amended Complaint within 30 days by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 01/07/10. (jjh, )
December 29, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER Allowing Plaintiff to Proceed Without Payment of Initial Partial Filing Fee. Order denying as moot 7 Motion to Waive the initial partial filing fee by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 12/29/09.(jjh, )
November 4, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER Directing Clerk to Commence Civil Action and Directing Plaintiff to Cure Deficiencies. Plaintiff shall have 30 days to file a certified copy of prisoner's trust fund statement, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 11/3/09. (jak, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Flahiff v. Cooper et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jared Flahiff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cooper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hassenfritz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hoyt Brill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?