McGee v. MWH Constructors, Inc.
Plaintiff: Douglas McGee
Defendant: MWH Constructors, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2009cv02632
Filed: November 9, 2009
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Philip A. Brimmer
Presiding Judge: Michael J. Watanabe
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 206 Collect Unpaid Wages
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 23, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 29 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER CONCERNING CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION Entered by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 3/23/2010. (mjwcd)
February 25, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER SETTING HEARING UNDER FED. R. CIV. P. 16: Hearing set for 4/8/2010 03:30 PM in Courtroom A 701 before Judge Philip A. Brimmer, by Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 2/25/10. (ebs, )
January 5, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 3/8/2010 08:30 AM in Courtroom A 502 before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 1/5/2010. (mjwcd )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McGee v. MWH Constructors, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Douglas McGee
Represented By: Bernard R. Mazaheri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MWH Constructors, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?