Russell v. Board of Commissioners of Larimer County, Colorado, The et al
Plaintiff: Debbra Russell
Defendant: Board of Commissioners of Larimer County, Colorado, The, Larimer County Sheriff's Department, James (I) A. Alderden and James A. Alderden
Case Number: 1:2009cv02652
Filed: November 11, 2009
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Larimer
Presiding Judge: Richard P. Matsch
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 6, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER DISMISSING CASE With Prejudice. Each party to pay their own costs and attorney's fees by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 08/06/10. (jjh, )
May 17, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER Setting Pretrial Conference for 11/5/2010 at 03:00 PM in Conference Room and proposed pretrial order due by 4:00 p.m. 10/28/2010 delivered in paper form directly to chambers. Jury Trial set for 12/13/2010 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom A, signed by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 5/17/2010. (rpmcd)
February 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER Setting Scheduling Conference for 5/14/2010 at 02:00 PM in Conference Room and proposed order (original only) on paper, shall be submitted directly to chambers by 4:00 p.m. on May 6, 2010, signed by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 2/8/2010. (rpmcd)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Russell v. Board of Commissioners of Larimer County, Colorado, The et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Debbra Russell
Represented By: JoAnne P. Hagen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Board of Commissioners of Larimer County, Colorado, The
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Larimer County Sheriff's Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James (I) A. Alderden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James A. Alderden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?