Alley v. Franz et al
Plaintiff: Ross Alley
Defendant: Paula Franz, Fortunato and Beverly Dowis
Case Number: 1:2009cv02713
Filed: November 18, 2009
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Logan
Presiding Judge: Wiley Y. Daniel
Presiding Judge: Boyd N. Boland
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 23, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER Affirming and Adopting Recommendation of United States Magistrate Judge. ORDERED that the Recommendation of United States Magistrate Judge 53 is AFFIRMED and ADOPTED. ORDERED that Defendants Motion for Summary Judgment 47 is GRANTED, and this case is DISMISSED by Chief Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 08/23/11.(jjh, )
September 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER STRIKING 40 Plaintiff's Letter. In the future, all applications to the court for relief shall be submitted in the form of a motion and shall be served on counsel for the defendants in accordance with Rule 5; and Failure to comply with the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and my orders may result in sanctions, including dismissal of this case. by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 9/9/2010. (erv, )
May 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER denying 28 Plaintiff's Motion for Order to Refute Defendants Answer by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 5/19/2010.(erv, )
April 13, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 21 MINUTE ORDER: granting 19 Motion to Vacate Preliminary SchedulingConference. Scheduling Conference reset for 5/6/2010 10:00 AM in Courtroom A 401 before Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 4/13/10.(bnbcd, )
February 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER Granting Service by the United States Marshal re: 9 Amended Complaint filed by Ross Alley by Chief Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 2/1/2010. (erv, )
January 29, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER Drawing Case. This case shall be drawn to a district judge and to a magistrate judge. By Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 01/29/2010. (sah, )
December 14, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER Directing Plaintiff to File Amended Complaint within 30 days by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 12/14/09. (jjh, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Alley v. Franz et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ross Alley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paula Franz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fortunato
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Beverly Dowis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?