Maverick Coil Tubing Services, LLC v. St. Paul Fire and Marine Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Maverick Coil Tubing Services, LLC
Defendant: St. Paul Fire and Marine Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2009cv02720
Filed: November 18, 2009
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Arapahoe
Presiding Judge: Marcia S. Krieger
Presiding Judge: Kathleen M. Tafoya
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Insurance Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 29, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER of Dismissal With Prejudice and to Close Case. Granting 37 Stipulated Motion for Dismissal With Prejudice. All claims asserted in the above-captioned matter are dismissed with prejudice, each party to bear his, her or its own costs and attorneys fees incurred in connection with this action. The Clerk shall close this case, by Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 7/29/10.(gmssl, )
March 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 28 TRIAL PREPARATION ORDER-CIVIL: Final Pretrial Conference set for 3/31/2011 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom A 901 before Judge Marcia S. Krieger. Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 3/9/10. (msksec, )
February 16, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER SETTING RULE 16(b) SCHEDULING CONFERENCE AND RULE 26(f) PLANNING MEETING: Scheduling Conference set for 3/9/2010 09:45 AM in Courtroom C201 before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 2/16/2010. (kmtcd, )
January 7, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting 13 Unopposed MOTION to Amend/Correct/Modify for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint by Plaintiff. Plaintiff shall file Second Amended Complaint by 01/08/2010 by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 1/7/2010.(kmtcd, )
December 8, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER SETTING HEARING UNDER FED.R.CIV.P. 16: Rule 16 Conference set for 2/16/2010 at 04:00 PM in Courtroom A 901 before Judge Marcia S. Krieger, by Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 12/08/2009. (wjc, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Maverick Coil Tubing Services, LLC v. St. Paul Fire and Marine Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maverick Coil Tubing Services, LLC
Represented By: Brent Daniel Chicken
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: St. Paul Fire and Marine Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?