Snider v. United Air Lines
Plaintiff: Laura Snider
Defendant: United Air Lines
Case Number: 1:2009cv02746
Filed: November 20, 2009
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Arapahoe
Presiding Judge: Robert E. Blackburn
Presiding Judge: Kristen L. Mix
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 2000 e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 29, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 53 MINUTE ORDER. The Stipulated Motion to Dismiss With Prejudice 52 is DENIED as moot. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 6/29/2011.(sah, )
December 14, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER. The Defendants Motion for Summary Judgment 27 filed 10/05/2010, is GRANTED. Judgment SHALL ENTER in favor of the defendant, United Air Lines, and against the plaintiff, Laura Snider, on all claims for relief and causes of action. The Trial P reparation Conference, currently scheduled for 1/7/2011, as well as the trial, currently scheduled to commence on 1/24/2011, are VACATED. Defendants Motion To Strike Certain Exhibits Attached To Plaintiffs Summary Judgment Response 42 filed 12/03/2010, is DENIED as moot. Defendant is AWARDED its costs. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 12/14/2010.(sah, )
December 10, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 45 MINUTE ORDER granting 43 Defendant's Unopposed Motion to Vacate Pretrial Conference. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 12/16/2010. Final Pretrial Conference reset for 12/20/2010 10:30 AM in Courtroom C204 before Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix., by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 12/10/10.(gmssl, )
December 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 41 MINUTE ORDER. Defendants Second Motion to Reschedule Settlement Conference 39 is GRANTED in part. The Settlement Conference set for 12/10/2010 at 9:00 a.m. is vacated. The Settlement Conference will be reset only upon joint motion of the parties. By Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 12/02/2010.(sah, )
November 10, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 35 MINUTE ORDER. Defendants Unopposed Motion to Reschedule Settlement Conference 3 is GRANTED IN PART. The Settlement Conference set for 12/01/2010 is VACATED and RESET to 12/10/2010 09:00 AM in Courtroom C204 before Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. By Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 11/10/2010.(sah, )
June 23, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 26 MINUTE ORDER. Defendants Stipulated Motion to AmendScheduling Order 24 is GRANTED. Expert Designation Deadline 08/10/2010; Rebuttal Expert Designation Deadline 09/10/2010; Discovery due by 9/15/2010; Dispositive Motions due by 10/11/2010. By Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 06/23/2010.(sah, )
May 3, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 23 MINUTE ORDER granting 21 Defendants Unopposed Motion to Amend Scheduling Order. The deadline for designation of experts is extended to 06/30/2010. By Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 05/03/2010.(sah, )
February 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 18 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 2/9/2010. (klmcd) Modified on 2/10/2010 to indicate that the protective order was stipulated (sah2, ).
February 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 14 TRIAL PREPARATION CONFERENCE ORDER by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 2/1/10. Trial Preparation Conference set for 1/7/2011 at 9:30 a.m.; five-day Jury Trial set to commence 1/24/2011 at 8:30 a.m. in courtroom A1001 before Judge Robert E. Blackburn.(rebcd)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Snider v. United Air Lines
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laura Snider
Represented By: John R. Olsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Air Lines
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?