Darwish v. Family Dollar Stores, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Nagham Darwish
Defendant: Family Dollar Stores, Inc., Chris Nielsen and Don Pack
Case Number: 1:2009cv02764
Filed: November 25, 2009
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Adams
Presiding Judge: Kristen L. Mix
Presiding Judge: Marcia S. Krieger
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 18, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 64 MINUTE ORDER denying as moot 59 Plaintiff's Motion to Permit Further Discovery Pursuant to Federal Rule Civil Procedure 56(f), and denying as moot 61 Plaintiff's Motion to File Amended Complaint, by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 6/18/2010. (mehcd)
May 20, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER granting 38 the Joint Motion to Quash Defendant Don Pack's Subpoena Duces Tecum of Third-Party Witness, by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 5/20/2010. (mehcd)
February 10, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 16 TRIAL PREPARATION ORDER-CIVIL: Final Pretrial Conference set for 2/3/2011 at 04:00 PM in Courtroom A 901 before Judge Marcia S. Krieger. Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 2/10/10. (msksec, )
January 7, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Magistrate Judge Mix recused. Clerk to assign another magistrate judge by random draw. By Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 01/07/2010. (sah, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Darwish v. Family Dollar Stores, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nagham Darwish
Represented By: Darold W. Killmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Family Dollar Stores, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chris Nielsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Don Pack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?