Davis v. Arundel et al
Plaintiff: Heather Davis
Defendant: James Arundel and Alan Rupe
Case Number: 1:2009cv02768
Filed: November 25, 2009
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Wiley Y. Daniel
Presiding Judge: Michael E. Hegarty
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 28, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 105 JUDGMENT by Clerk in favor of Diane S. King against Heather Davis re: 104 Order for Entry of Judgment. By Clerk on 3/28/13. (kfinn, )
March 27, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 104 ORDER FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 3/27/13. (kfinn, )
March 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 103 ORDER CONCERNING MOTION FOR ATTORNEY FEES. Plaintiff's 91 Motion to Reconsider Court's March 22, 2012 Order is denied. The 100 Motion to Strike Lien Claimant's Reply in Support of Motion for Attorney's Fees is denied. Lien Cl aimant's 89 Motion for Attorney's Fees and Costs is granted in part. Lien claimant, Diane S. King of King & Griesen, LLP, is awarded attorney fees and costs of 14,414 dollars ($14,414). The attorney lien of Diane S. King may be en forced against funds currently held in the court registry and tethered to the claimants 5 Notice of Lien. Otherwise, the Lien Claimant's 89 Motion for Attorney's Fees and Costs is denied. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 3/25/13.(mnfsl, )
May 23, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 97 MINUTE ORDER granting 95 Motion to Withdraw Document 94 Reply to Response to Motion and granting 96 Motion By Lien Claimant For Leave To Submit Reply in Support of Motion For Attorney's Fees and Costs. The Lien Claimant's Reply in Support of Motion For Attorney's Fees and Costs [96-1] is accepted for filing, by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 5/23/12.(mjgsl, )
March 22, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 88 ORDER RE: ATTORNEY'S LIEN. WITHDRAW the 76 reference of the 75 lien claimant's Motion for Enforcement of Attorney's Lien. The 75 lien claimant's Motion for Enforcement of Attorney's Lien is GRANTED on the terms stated in this order. The 81 Plaintiff's Objection to Review of Motion for Enforcement of Attorney's Lien for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction, Or, in The Alternative, Request to Recuse Judge Watanabe from Review Of Motion to Enforce Attorney's Lien and Related Actions Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 455(b)(1) is DENIED, by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 03/22/2012.(wjcsl, )
November 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER. Kutak's Motion to Deposit Funds into Court Registry 68 is GRANTED. Kutak shall deposit the amount stated in the motion into the Court registry within seven days of this order. By Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 11/08/2010.(sah, )
November 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER OF DISMISSAL. The Stipulation of Dismissal 65 is APPROVED. The Trial Preparation Conference set for 04/15/2011 is VACATED. The jury trial set for 05/02/2011 is VACATED. This action is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE with the parties to pay their own attorney fees and costs. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 11/01/2010. (sah, )
August 30, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 52 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER. By Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 08/30/2010. (sah, )
May 11, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 34 TRIAL PREPARATION CONFERENCE ORDER Five (5) day Jury Trial set for 5/2/2011 08:30 AM in Courtroom A1001 before Judge Robert E. Blackburn. Trial Preparation Conference set for 4/15/2011 at 03:30 PM in Courtroom A1001 before Judge Robert E. Blackburn. by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 5/11/10. (rebsec, )
April 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER. Plaintiffs Notice of Dismissal of Individual Defendants Pursuant To Fed.R.Civ.P. 41 23 filed 03/31/2010, is APPROVED. Plaintiffs claims against defendants, James Arundel and Alan Rupe, are DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Defendants, James Arundel and Alan Rupe, are DROPPED as named parties to this litigation, and the case caption is amended accordingly. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 04/01/2010. (sah, )
March 29, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER Of Recusal directing reassignment to another judge. By Chief Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 03/29/2010. (sah, )
March 25, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER Setting Scheduling Conference for 5/11/2010 09:30 AM in Courtroom A 502 before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe. by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 3/25/2010. (erv, )
March 3, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER OF RECUSAL directing reassignment to another magistrate judge. By Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 03/03/2010. (sah, )
February 16, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER OF RECUSAL AND ORDER ON MOTION: I hereby recuse myself from service in this matter. I direct the Clerk of the Court to cause this matter to be reassigned by random draw to another Magistrate Judge; 7 Plaintiff's Motion to Vacate the Scheduling Conference. Scheduling Conference set for 2/19/2010 is vacated. By Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 2/16/2010. (mehcd)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Davis v. Arundel et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Heather Davis
Represented By: Jennifer Anne Hall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Arundel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alan Rupe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?