Winn v. City of Aurora et al
Plaintiff: Debra Winn
Defendant: City of Aurora, City and County of Denver and Francis Fania
Case Number: 1:2009cv02781
Filed: November 30, 2009
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Arapahoe
Presiding Judge: Lewis T. Babcock
Presiding Judge: Boyd N. Boland
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 25, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER. The recommendation is accepted and Defendants Motion to Dismiss 53 is GRANTED and this action is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. By Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 4/25/2011.(sah, )
November 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 50 MINUTE ORDER. The Motions to Withdraw 47 and 48 - both filed 10/01/2010 are GRANTED. Kevin C. Flesch of the Law Office of Kevin C. Flesch is allowed to withdraw as counsel for Plaintiff herein. Plaintiff shall proceed pro se in this matter. By Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 11/15/2010.(sah, )
May 21, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER. Defendant The City and County of Denvers Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 129b)(6), filed 12/29/2009 6 is GRANTED. Defendant Fanias Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(1) and 12(b)(6) 10 is DENIED; and Defenda nt City of Auroras (hereinafter Aurora) Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 12(b)(6), filed 02/09/2010 11 is GRANTED. It is FURTHER ORDERED that the claims against Defendant The City and County ofDenver and Defendant City of Aurora are DISMISSED, with costs awarded to them. By Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 05/21/2010.(sah, )
May 3, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER. Plaintiffs Motion to Amend Complaint 28 is GRANTED. The pending motions to dismiss will be considered as to the Amended Complaint. By Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 05/03/2010.(sah, )
April 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 27 PROTECTIVE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 4/8/10. (bnbcd, )
February 18, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 3/25/2010 08:30 AM in Courtroom A 401 before Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 2/181/0. (bnbcd, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Winn v. City of Aurora et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Debra Winn
Represented By: Kevin C. Flesch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Aurora
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City and County of Denver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Francis Fania
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?