Hernandez v. City of Denver et al
Plaintiff: Daniel Hernandez
Defendant: City of Denver, Michael (I) Walsh, Michael Walsh, Lexido (I) Jorge and Lexido Jorge
Case Number: 1:2009cv02783
Filed: November 30, 2009
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Denver
Presiding Judge: Richard P. Matsch
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 21, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER for Dismissal. ORDERED that this action is dismissed with prejudice, each party to pay their own costs and attorneys fees by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 11/21/11. (jjh, )
July 26, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER Setting Pretrial Conference for 10/14/2011 at 02:00 PM in Conference Room and Proposed Pretrial Order due by 4:00 p.m. 10/6/2011, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 7/26/2011. (rpmcd )
March 3, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER Setting Pretrial Conference for 4/19/2011 at 02:00 PM in Conference Room and Proposed Pretrial Order due by 4:00 p.m. 4/14/2011, Signed by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 3/3/2011. (rpmcd )
December 16, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER Granting 27 Unopposed Motion to Modify 21 Scheduling Order. Discovery due by 2/18/2011. Dispositive Motions due by 3/25/2011. Signed by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 12/16/2010.(rpmcd)
September 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER Granting 22 Stipulated Motion to Amend 21 Scheduling Order. Discovery due by 12/20/2010, Dispositive Motions due by 1/24/2011, (see Order for other deadlines), signed by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 9/8/2010.(rpmcd)
April 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 19 PROTECTIVE ORDER re: 18 , signed by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 4/12/2010. (rpmcd)
March 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER Setting Scheduling Conference for 4/30/2010 at 03:30 PM in Conference Room and proposed order (original only) on paper, shall be submitted directly to chambers by 4:00 p.m. on April 22, 2010, signed by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 3/8/2010. (rpmcd)
December 11, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER Granting Permission to Withdraw and Substitution of Counsel re: 9 . Lori Beck's permission to withdraw is granted and Jill Gookin's appearance for plaintiff Daniel Hernandez is accepted, signed by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 12/11/2009. (rpmcd)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hernandez v. City of Denver et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Hernandez
Represented By: Lori A. Beck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Denver
Represented By: Stuart L. Shapiro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael (I) Walsh
Represented By: Stuart L. Shapiro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Walsh
Represented By: Stuart L. Shapiro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lexido (I) Jorge
Represented By: Stuart L. Shapiro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lexido Jorge
Represented By: Stuart L. Shapiro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?