Domenico v. Wilner
Petitioner: Philip F. Domenico
Respondent: J. M. Wilner
Case Number: 1:2009cv02798
Filed: December 1, 2009
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Fremont
Presiding Judge: Boyd N. Boland
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2241 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (federa
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 5, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER. The Application for a Writ of Habeas Corpus Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. §2241 3 filed on 12/01/2009, by Applicant Philip F. Domenico is DENIED. This case is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 4/5/2011. (sah, )
March 29, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER Drawing Case. This case shall be drawn to a district judge and to a magistrate judge. By Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 03/29/2010. (sah, )
December 1, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER Directing Clerk to Commence Civil Action and Directing Applicant to Cure Deficiency. Applicant shall have 30 days to file a certificate showing balance in prison account, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 11/30/09. (jak, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Domenico v. Wilner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Philip F. Domenico
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: J. M. Wilner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?