Blehm v. Jacobs et al
Plaintiff: Gary D. Blehm
Defendant: Albert A. Jacobs, John Jacobs, Life is Good Company, The, Life is Good Wholesale, Inc. and Life is Good Retail, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2009cv02865
Filed: December 8, 2009
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: El Paso
Presiding Judge: Richard P. Matsch
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17 U.S.C. ยง 101 Copyright Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 28, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 79 JUDGMENT by Clerk re 78 Order : Defendants' motion for recovery of full costs is denied, by Deputy Clerk on 3/28/2013. (rpmcd)
November 9, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER 64 GRANTING STAY OF EXECUTION re 51 AND APPROVAL OF SUPERSEDEAS BOND, (see Order for details), by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 11/9/2011.(rpmcd )
September 19, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER Granting Defendants' 33 Motion for Summary Judgment. The Clerk shall enter judgment for the Defendants, dismissing the Second Amended Complaint and this civil action and awarding costs, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 9/19/2011.(rpmcd )
September 1, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 49 Courtroom Minutes for Motion Hearing held on 9/1/2011 before Judge Richard P. Matsch. ORDERED: Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment 33 , is taken under advisement. (FTR: B. Abiakam) (rpmcd)
July 21, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER Granting 43 Motion to Withdraw. Attorney Kenneth R. Morris is now withdrawn as attorney of record for Plaintiff in this matter, and the Clerk is directed to terminate his electronic service in this case, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 7/21/2011.(rpmcd)
April 18, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER Granting 36 Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion for Enlargement of Time Pursuant to F.R.C.P. Rule 6(b)(1)(A) to Respond to Defendants' 33 Motion for Summary Judgment to on or before May 30, 2011, signed by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 4/18/2011. (rpmcd)
April 12, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 35 Stay ORDER : Discovery in this civil action is stayed pending disposition of the defendants 33 motion for summary judgment. Joint 34 Motion to Amend Case Management Order is denied on the expectation that a new order will be considered if the motion for summary judgment is denied. Signed by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 4/12/2011. (rpmcd)
January 25, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 32 SECOND AMENDED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Granting 31 Parties' Joint Motion to Amend 26 Case Management Order. Discovery due by 7/19/2011. Dispositive Motions due by 8/15/2011. Signed by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 1/25/2011.(rpmcd)
November 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER Granting 28 Joint Motion to Amend Case Management 26 Order. Discovery due by 5/20/2011. Dispositive Motions due by 6/15/2011. (See Order for Other Deadlines) Signed by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 11/12/2010.(rpmcd)
June 7, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 24 Stipulated PROTECTIVE ORDER re 23 , signed by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 6/7/2010. (rpmcd )
February 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER Setting Scheduling Conference for 4/15/2010 at 02:30 PM in Conference Room and proposed order (original only) on paper, shall be submitted directly to chambers by 4:00 p.m. on April 8, 2010, signed by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 2/2/2010. (rpmcd)
January 14, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER Granting 9 Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion For Leave To File Second Amended Complaint And Jury Demand attached thereto is deemed filed as of the date of this Order, signed by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 1/14/2010.(rpmcd)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Blehm v. Jacobs et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gary D. Blehm
Represented By: Thomas P. Howard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Albert A. Jacobs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Jacobs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Life is Good Company, The
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Life is Good Wholesale, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Life is Good Retail, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?