Kenner v. Lighthouse Recovery Associates, LLC
Plaintiff: Damon Kenner
Defendant: Lighthouse Recovery Associates, LLC
Case Number: 1:2009cv02877
Filed: December 9, 2009
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Wiley Y. Daniel
Presiding Judge: Craig B. Shaffer
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1692 Fair Debt Collection Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 30, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 16 AMENDED SECOND ORDER setting a Scheduling Conference for 5/13/2010 at 8:30 a.m., in Courtroom A 402. Counsel are directed to note the substantive changes made throughout the Order, by Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer on 3/29/10. (cbssec)
March 23, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 14 SECOND ORDER setting a Scheduling Conference for 5/13/2010 at 8:30 a.m., in Courtroom A 402, by Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer on 3/23/10. (cbssec)
December 18, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER setting Scheduling Conference for 3/15/2010 at 8:30 a.m., in Courtroom A 402, by Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer on 12/18/09. (cbssec)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kenner v. Lighthouse Recovery Associates, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Damon Kenner
Represented By: Nicholas J. Bontrager
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lighthouse Recovery Associates, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?