Braswell et al v. Polaris Industries, Inc.
Plaintiff: Erik Braswell and Josh Alexander
Defendant: Polaris Industries, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2009cv02919
Filed: December 11, 2009
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Garfield
Presiding Judge: Robert E. Blackburn
Presiding Judge: Boyd N. Boland
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 27, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER OF DISMISSAL. The Stipulation of Dismissal With Prejudice 31 filed 04/27/2010, is APPROVED. The Trial Preparation Conference set for 02/18/2011 isVACATED. The jury trial set to commence 03/07/2011, is VACATED. Any pending motion is DENIED as moot. This action is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 04/27/2010. (sah, )
February 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 24 TRIAL PREPARATION CONFERENCE ORDER. Ten (10) day Jury Trial set for 3/7/2011 08:30 AM in Courtroom A1001 before Judge Robert E. Blackburn. Trial Preparation Conference set for 2/18/2011 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom A1001 before Judge Robert E. Blackburn. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 2/22/10. (rebsec, ) Modified on 2/23/2010 to correct the Trial Preparation Conference date (sah2, ).
February 4, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER : Supplemental Scheduling Conference set for 2/22/2010 08:30 AM in Courtroom A 401 before Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland. The parties shall prepare a revised scheduling order, modified as discussed at the conference this morning, and submit it to the court on or before February 15, 2010, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 2/4/10. (bnbcd, )
February 3, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 18 PROTECTIVE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 2/3/10. (bnbcd, )
December 29, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 2/4/2010 09:00 AM in Courtroom A 401 before Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 12/29/09. (bnbcd, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Braswell et al v. Polaris Industries, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Erik Braswell
Represented By: Paul Withington Gertz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Josh Alexander
Represented By: Paul Withington Gertz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Polaris Industries, Inc.
Represented By: Robert Campbell Troyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?