Trujillo et al v. Campbell et al
Plaintiff: Vicki (I) Lynn Trujillo and Vicki Lynn Trujillo
Defendant: Timothy (I) Campbell, Timothy Campbell, Gerald (I) R. Whitman, Gerald R. Whitman and City and County of Denver
Case Number: 1:2009cv03011
Filed: December 29, 2009
Court: U.S. District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Denver
Presiding Judge: Boyd N. Boland
Presiding Judge: Kathleen M. Tafoya
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 26, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 213 ORDER of Dismissal with Prejudice re: 212 Stipulation To Dismiss With Prejudice by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 12/26/12.(dkals, )
October 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 203 ORDER denying 191 Motion for Entry of Judgment under Rule 54 (b), and denying as moot 184 Motion for Leave to Appeal in Forma Pauperis re 185 Notice of Appeal and 192 Motion to Stay by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 10/10/12.(dkals, )
August 22, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 179 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 121 Motion for Summary Judgment and denying as moot 172 Motion to Strike by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 8/22/12.(dkals, )
May 21, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 170 ORDER Granting in part and denying in part 156 Motion for Attorney Fees. Granting 166 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave of Court to Supplement Plaintiff's Reply in Support of Motion for Attorney's Fees. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendant City and County of Denver shall remit payment of $2,382.50 to Plaintiff on or before 6/21/2012. By Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 5/21/2012.(jjpsl, ) Modified on 5/21/2012 (jjpsl, ).
March 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 153 ORDER granting in part 126 Third Motion to Compel Answers to Interrogatories from Defendant City and County of Denver. ORDERED that Plaintiff may file a Supplemental Response in opposition to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment 121 on or before 4/16/12. Defendants may Reply in support of their Motion for Summary Judgment on or before 4/30/2012. By Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 3/19/2012.(jjpsl, )
March 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 148 ORDER REJECTING 2/9/2012 131 Order on Motion to Compel. 126 Third MOTION to Compel Answers to Interrogatories From Defendant City and County of Denver is reinstated. The Court REFERS Plaintiff's Third Motion to Compel to the Magistrate Judge for reconsideration. By Judge Christine M. Arguello on 3/13/2012. (jjpsl, )
February 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 131 MINUTE ORDER denying 126 Motion to Compel. Denver may file a motion for fees, in compliance with D.C.COLO.LCivR 54.3, on or before 2/23/12. By Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 2/9/12.(cmacd )
October 3, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 105 ORDER OF RECUSAL directing reassignment to another magistrate judge and the motions hearing set for October 4, 2011 at 9:30 a.m. is VACATED . By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 10/3/2011.(sah2, ) Modified on 10/4/2011 to include language with regards to the vacating of the motions hearing (sah2, ).
October 20, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 60 Minute Entry for continuation of Motion Hearing 59 held on 10/20/2010 before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya, granting in part and denying in part 35 Motion to Compel, granting in part and denying in part 36 Motion to Compel, and granting in part and denying in part 34 Motion to Compel.(Court Reporter FTR - Nick Richards)(kmtcd)
October 18, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 59 Minute Entry for Motion Hearing held on 10/18/2010 before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya, granting in part and denying in part 40 Motion to Enforce and granting in part and denying in part 33 Motion to Compel. Defendants' request to den y all the plaintiff's motion for failure to confer in violation of Local Rule 7.1 is denied. Discovery due by 5/10/2011. Dispositive Motions due by 6/10/2011. Final Pretrial Conference set for 8/9/2011 10:00 AM in Courtroom C201 before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. This hearing is continued to October 20, 2010 at 10:00 a.m. (Court Reporter FTR - Nick Richards) (kmtcd)
July 7, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 28 MINUTE ORDER denying 26 Plaintiff's Motion to Clarify Courts Minute Order Dated July 1, 2010. The deadline for Defendants to respond to all of Plaintiffs written discovery requests remains at July 8, 2010. The court finds that Plaintiff will n ot be prejudiced if Defendants are permitted additional time to respond to Plaintiffs discovery requests, notwithstanding the fact that Defendants Unopposed Motion for Enlargement of Time 23 , filed July 1, 2010 was filed after several of their resp onses to Plaintiffs discovery requests were due. As such, the court finds that it would have granted Defendants Motion for Enlargement of Time outright, even if Plaintiff had opposed that motion on the grounds outlined in her Motion to Clarify. by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 7/7/2010.(erv, )
May 6, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 22 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 5/6/2010. (erv, )
April 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 18 Minute ORDER denying without prejudice 16 Motion for Protective Order. The proposed Protective Order is REFUSED by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 4/19/2010.(kmtcd, )
March 30, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER SETTING SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE: Settlement Conference set for 7/30/2010 09:00 AM in Courtroom C201 before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 3/30/2010. (kmtcd, )
January 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER Scheduling Conference set for 3/30/2010 09:15 AM in Courtroom C201 before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 1/12/2010. (erv, )
January 5, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER Drawing Case. This case shall be drawn to a district judge and to a magistrate judge. By Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 01/05/2010. (sah, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Trujillo et al v. Campbell et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vicki (I) Lynn Trujillo
Represented By: Kenneth Alfredo Padilla
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vicki Lynn Trujillo
Represented By: Kenneth Alfredo Padilla
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Timothy (I) Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Timothy Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gerald (I) R. Whitman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gerald R. Whitman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City and County of Denver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?