Canadian National Railway Company v. Caprock Pipe & Supply, Inc.
Plaintiff: Canadian National Railway Company
Defendant: Caprock Pipe & Supply, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2009cv03030
Filed: December 30, 2009
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: XX Outside US
Presiding Judge: Richard P. Matsch
Presiding Judge: Michael J. Watanabe
Nature of Suit: Commerce ICC Rates, Etc.
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1337 Sherman-Clayton Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER for Dismissal. Ordered that this civil action is dismissed by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 05/12/10. (jjh, )
March 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER REJECTING SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT re: 5 Settlement Agreement, signed by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 3/12/2010. (rpmcd)
January 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 3/12/2010 09:30 AM in Courtroom A 502 before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 1/15/2010. (mjwcd )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Canadian National Railway Company v. Caprock Pipe & Supply, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Canadian National Railway Company
Represented By: John K. Fiorilla
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Caprock Pipe & Supply, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?