Mitcham et al v. Nationstar Mortgage, LLC et al
Petitioner: Lewis Jackson Mitcham and Marsha J. Mitcham
Respondent: Nationstar Mortgage, LLC, Anthony H. Barone and Margaret T. Chapman
Case Number: 1:2009cv03038
Filed: December 31, 2009
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Jefferson
Presiding Judge: Philip A. Brimmer
Presiding Judge: Kristen L. Mix
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity - Real Property
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 5, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE pursuant to the 28 Stipulation for Dismissal With Prejudice. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a), this matter, and all claims asserted therein, is dismissed with prejudice, with each party to bear its own attorneys fees and costs, by Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 3/5/10. (ebs, )
February 11, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER granting 22 Defendant Margaret T. Chapman's Unopposed Motion to Stay Discovery. Discovery as to Defendant Chapman is stayed, until such time as the Court rules on Defendant Chapman's Motion to Dismiss, by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 2/11/10.(ebs, )
February 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 20 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Philip A. Brimmer. Motion Hearing held on 2/2/2010. Denying 10 Motion for TRO; Denying 10 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Denying 16 Supplement/Amendment to Motion for TRO and Preliminary Injunction. (Court Reporter Janet Coppock) (pabcd)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mitcham et al v. Nationstar Mortgage, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Lewis Jackson Mitcham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Marsha J. Mitcham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Nationstar Mortgage, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Anthony H. Barone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Margaret T. Chapman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?