Doyle v. Denver Department of Human Services
Plaintiff: Celeste Doyle
Defendant: City and County of Denver and Denver Department of Human Services
Case Number: 1:2009cv03042
Filed: December 31, 2009
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Wiley Y Daniel
Referring Judge: Kathleen M Tafoya
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 2000 e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 7, 2012. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 7, 2012 Filing 158 Docket Annotation re: #157 Clerk's Judgment. The NEF for this document to Linda Marie Davison was returned as undeliverable. Niels Loechell advises that Ms. Davison is no longer with the Denver City Attorney's Office and no longer involved in this matter. Mr. Loechell continues to represent Denver Department of Human Services. Ms. Davison's noticing has, therefore, been terminated. Text Only Entry. (wjc, )
March 1, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 157 SECOND AMENDED FINAL JUDGMENT #144 . ORDERED that judgment is hereby entered in favor of Defendant, Denver Department of Human Services, and against Plaintiff, Celeste Doyle, on Plaintiff's claims of retaliation andhostile work environment in violation of Title VII of the Civil Rights Act of 1964. It is further ORDERED that plaintiffs complaint and action are dismissed with prejudice by Clerk on 03/01/12 and Approved as to Form by Chief Judge Daniel (jjhsl, )
February 29, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 156 ORDER. ORDERED that Plaintiff's Motion for New Trial #147 is DENIED. ORDERED that Plaintiff's Motion for Denial of Taxation of Costs #150 is GRANTED. The Clerk of Court shall amend the Judgment to reflect that costs are not awarded in this case by Chief Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 02/29/12.(jjhsl, )
February 15, 2012 Filing 155 REPLY to Response to #150 MOTION for Order to Deny Taxation of Costs filed by Plaintiff Celeste Doyle. (Rogers, Joseph)
February 10, 2012 Filing 154 REPLY to Response to #147 MOTION for New Trial filed by Plaintiff Celeste Doyle. (Rogers, Joseph)
February 1, 2012 Filing 153 RESPONSE to #150 MOTION for Order to Deny Taxation of Costs filed by Defendant Denver Department of Human Services. (Davison, Linda)
February 1, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 152 MINUTE ORDER granting #151 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to Motion for New Trial by Chief Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 02/01/12.(jjh, )
January 31, 2012 Filing 151 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #147 MOTION for New Trial by Plaintiff Celeste Doyle. (Rogers, Joseph)
January 31, 2012 Filing 150 MOTION for Order to Deny Taxation of Costs by Plaintiff Celeste Doyle. (Rogers, Joseph)
January 24, 2012 Filing 149 Costs Taxed in amount of $ 2,475.08 against Plaintiff (jjh, )
January 17, 2012 Filing 148 RESPONSE to #147 MOTION for New Trial filed by Defendant Denver Department of Human Services. (Davison, Linda)
January 11, 2012 Filing 147 MOTION for New Trial by Plaintiff Celeste Doyle. (Rogers, Joseph)
December 22, 2011 Filing 145 Proposed Bill of Costs by Defendant Denver Department of Human Services. (Attachments: #1 Continuation of Main Document statement regarding conferral, #2 Continuation of Main Document bill of cost supporting documents)(Davison, Linda)
December 21, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 146 ORDER. The #107 Order to Show Cause is DISCHARGED, by Chief Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 12/21/2011. (wjc, )
December 20, 2011 Filing 144 AMENDED FINAL JUDGMENT re: #143 by Clerk on 12/20/11. Approved as to Form by Chief Judge Daniel (jjh, )
December 15, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 143 FINAL JUDGMENT. ORDERED that judgment is hereby entered in favor of Defendant, Denver Department of Human Services, and against Plaintiff, Celeste Doyle, on Plaintiffs claims of retaliation in violation of Title VII of the Civil Rights Act of 1964. ORDERED that plaintiffs complaint and action are dismissed with prejudice. ORDERED that Defendant shall have its costs by the filing of a Bill of Costs with the Clerk of this Court within 14 days of entry of judgment by Deputy Clerk and Approved as to Form by Chief Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 12/15/11. (jjh, )
December 13, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 142 ORDER REGARDING CUSTODY OF EXHIBITS AND DEPOSTIONS entered by Chief Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 12/13/11. (wydcd, rrk)
December 13, 2011 Filing 141 JURY VERDICT. (wydcd, rrk)
December 13, 2011 Filing 140 Final Jury Instructions and Verdict Form. (wydcd, rrk)
December 13, 2011 Filing 139 MINUTE ENTRY for Jury Trial (Day 7) proceedings completed on 12/13/2011 before Chief Judge Wiley Y. Daniel. JURY VERDICT. Pursuant to General Order 2007-3 the original Jury Verdict has been filed conventionally by delivery to the Clerks Office. A representation of the Jury Verdict is attached to the court minutes. (Court Reporter: Therese Lindblom) (Attachments: #1 Plaintiff's Jury Instruction 22 - Refused, #2 Plaintiff's Witness List, #3 Plaintiff's Exhibit List, #4 Defendant's Witness List, #5 Defendant's Exhibit List, #6 Note from Jury - Verdict) (wydcd, rrk)
December 12, 2011 Filing 138 MINUTE ENTRY for Jury Trial (Day 6) proceedings held on 12/12/2011 before Chief Judge Wiley Y. Daniel. (Court Reporter: Therese Lindblom) (Attachments: #1 Defendant's Special Interrogatories Refused). (wydcd, rrk)
December 9, 2011 Filing 137 MINUTE ENTRY for Jury Trial (Day 5) proceedings held on 12/9/2011 before Chief Judge Wiley Y. Daniel. (Court Reporter: Therese Lindblom) (wydcd, rrk)
December 8, 2011 Filing 136 MINUTE ENTRY for Jury Trial (Day 4) proceedings held on 12/8/2011 before Chief Judge Wiley Y. Daniel. (Court Reporter: Therese Lindblom) (wydcd, rrk)
December 7, 2011 Filing 135 MINUTE ENTRY for Jury Trial (Day 3) proceedings held on 12/7/2011 before Chief Judge Wiley Y. Daniel. (Court Reporter: Therese Lindblom) (wydcd, rrk)
December 6, 2011 Filing 134 MINUTE ENTRY for Jury Trial (Day 2) proceedings held on 12/6/2011 before Chief Judge Wiley Y. Daniel. (Court Reporter: Therese Lindblom) (wydcd, rrk)
December 5, 2011 Filing 133 MINUTE ENTRY for Jury Trial (Day 1) proceedings held on 12/5/2011 before Chief Judge Wiley Y. Daniel. (Court Reporter: Therese Lindblom) (Attachments: #1 Jury Strike Sheet) (wydcd, rrk)
December 2, 2011 Filing 132 STIPULATION Plaintiff's Final Exhibit List by Plaintiff Celeste Doyle. (Rogers, Joseph)
November 30, 2011 Filing 131 RESPONSE To Defendant's Proposed Jury Instructions by Plaintiff Celeste Doyle. (Rogers, Joseph)
November 30, 2011 Filing 130 Proposed Jury Instructions (The Parties Stipulated Statement of The Case) by Plaintiff Celeste Doyle. (Rogers, Joseph)
November 30, 2011 Filing 129 Exhibit List by Defendant Denver Department of Human Services. (Davison, Linda)
November 30, 2011 Filing 128 Proposed Jury Instructions Objections to disputed jury instructions, alternative instructions, and special interrogatories and verdict forms by Defendant Denver Department of Human Services. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Document, #2 Proposed Document)(Davison, Linda)
November 30, 2011 Filing 127 Proposed Jury Instructions (The Parties Stipulated) by Plaintiff Celeste Doyle. (Rogers, Joseph)
November 30, 2011 Filing 126 Proposed Jury Instructions (The Parties Stipulated General, Non-Claim Specific) by Plaintiff Celeste Doyle. (Rogers, Joseph)
November 29, 2011 Filing 125 MINUTE ENTRY for continuation of Trial Preparation Conference proceedings held on 11/29/2011 before Chief Judge Wiley Y. Daniel. (Court Reporter: Therese Lindblom) (wydcd, rrk)
November 29, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 123 ORDER. Ordered that Defendant's Motions in Limine #118 , #119 , and #120 are Stricken. ORDERED that on or before Wednesday, November 30, 2011, the parties will submit a joint stipulated statement of the case and a stipulated set of instructions. ORDERED that on or before Wednesday, November 30, 2011, the parties will submit revised exhibit lists whereby the parties delete duplicative instructions and reach maximum agreement to authenticity and/or admissibility of the exhibits by Chief Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 11/29/11. (jjh, )
November 29, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 122 MINUTE ORDER counsel are ordered to appear for a continuation of the Trial Preparation Conference set for 11/29/2011 at 02:30 PM in Courtroom A1002 before Chief Judge Wiley Y. Daniel. Entered by Chief Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 11/29/11. (wydcd, rrk)
November 21, 2011 Filing 124 MINUTE ENTRY for Trial Preparation Conference proceedings held on 11/21/2011 before Chief Judge Wiley Y. Daniel. Amended on page 2 as highlighted. (Court Reporter: Therese Lindblom) (wydcd, rrk)
November 21, 2011 Filing 121 MINUTE ENTRY for Trial Preparation Conference proceedings held on 11/21/2011 before Chief Judge Wiley Y. Daniel. Denying and striking #118 Motion in Limine. Denying and striking #119 Motion in Limine. Denying and striking #120 Motion in Limine. Counsel shall submit revised jury instructions not later than Wednesday, November 30, 2011. Counsel shall file revised exhibit lists, that eliminate all duplicate exhibits and reflect maximum agreement as to stipulated exhibits, not later than Wednesday, November 30, 2011. (Court Reporter: Therese Lindblom) (wydcd, rrk)
November 21, 2011 Filing 120 STRICKEN MOTION in Limine Notice of Decision on Unemployment Benefits by Defendant Denver Department of Human Services. (Davison, Linda) Modified on 11/29/2011stricken pursuant tot the Minutes of 11/21/11 (jjh, ).
November 21, 2011 Filing 119 STRICKEN MOTION in Limine Confidential settlement Letter and Statements of Counsel by Defendant Denver Department of Human Services. (Davison, Linda) Modified on 11/29/2011 stricken pursuant tot the Minutes of 11/21/11 (jjh, ).
November 21, 2011 Filing 118 STRICKEN MOTION in Limine Plaintiff's testimony about defense counsel, Ex. 66, and Magistrate Tafoya's protective order by Defendant Denver Department of Human Services. (Davison, Linda) Modified on 11/29/2011 stricken pursuant tot the Minutes of 11/21/11 (jjh, ).
November 21, 2011 Filing 117 Proposed Jury Instructions amended H and I, interrogatories and verdict forms by Defendant Denver Department of Human Services. (Davison, Linda)
November 20, 2011 Filing 116 Proposed Jury Instructions (General, Non-Claim Specific) by Plaintiff Celeste Doyle. (Rogers, Joseph)
November 18, 2011 Filing 115 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re #107 by Plaintiff Celeste Doyle. (Rogers, Joseph)
November 18, 2011 Filing 114 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re #107 by Defendant Denver Department of Human Services. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit)(Davison, Linda)
November 18, 2011 Filing 113 Proposed Voir Dire by Plaintiff Celeste Doyle. (Rogers, Joseph)
November 17, 2011 Filing 112 Witness List by Plaintiff Celeste Doyle. (Rogers, Joseph)
November 17, 2011 Filing 111 Exhibit List by Plaintiff Celeste Doyle. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Plaintiff's Final Exhibit List)(Rogers, Joseph)
November 17, 2011 Filing 110 Witness List (may call) by Defendant Denver Department of Human Services. (Davison, Linda)
November 17, 2011 Filing 109 Witness List by Defendant Denver Department of Human Services. (Davison, Linda)
November 17, 2011 Filing 108 Exhibit List by Defendant Denver Department of Human Services. (Davison, Linda)
November 17, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 107 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: returnable by parties why sanctions should not be imposed for failure to comply with Practice Standards. Show Cause Response due by 11/18/2011 at 5:00 p.m., by Chief Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 11/17/11. (gmssl, )
November 8, 2011 Filing 106 Proposed Jury Instructions by Plaintiff Celeste Doyle. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 10th Circuit Model Employment Law Jury Instructions)(Rogers, Joseph)
November 8, 2011 Filing 105 Proposed Jury Instructions by Defendant Denver Department of Human Services. (Davison, Linda)
November 8, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 104 ORDER on Summary Judgment Motions. ORDERED that Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment is GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART. The Motion is GRANTED as to Plaintiff's claims of discrimination based on race and national origin. The Motion is DENIED as to Plaintiff's retaliation claim and hostile work environment claim. ORDERED that Plaintiffs Motion for Summary Judgment is DENIED by Chief Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 11/08/11.(jjh, )
November 1, 2011 Filing 103 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Jury Instructions by Plaintiff Celeste Doyle. (Rogers, Joseph)
August 2, 2011 Filing 102 Minute Entry - Courtroom Minutes for Status Conference held before Chief Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 8/2/2011. ORDERED: Case is set for a trial to jury beginning on Monday, December 5, 2011, at 9:00 a.m. Final trial preparation conference is set Monday, November 21, 2011, at 2:30 p.m. (Court Reporter: Therese Lindblom) (lbush)
August 2, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 101 ORDER Setting Final Trial Preparation Conference for 11/21/2011 at 02:30 PM before Chief Judge Wiley Y. Daniel. Ordered that this matter is set for Jury Trial on 12/5/2011 09:00 AM in Courtroom A1002 before Chief Judge Wiley Y. Daniel by Chief Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 08/02/11. (jjh, )
July 6, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 100 MINUTE ORDER Setting Status Conference for 8/2/2011 11:00 AM before Chief Judge Wiley Y. Daniel by Chief Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 07/06/11. (jjh, )
June 28, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 99 MINUTE ORDER granting #98 Motion for Extension of Time. The parties have up to and including 07/06/11, in which to jointly contact my Chambers to set this case for trial by Chief Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 06/28/11.(jjh, )
June 28, 2011 Filing 98 MOTION for Extension of Time to by Defendant Denver Department of Human Services. (Loechell, Niels)
June 24, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 97 MINUTE ORDER. The parties shall jointly contact Chambers by Friday, July 1, 2011, to set this case for trial by Chief Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 06/24/11. (jjh, )
June 22, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 96 PRETRIAL ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 6/22/2011. (kmtcd)
June 21, 2011 Filing 95 Proposed Pretrial Order by Plaintiff Celeste Doyle. (Rogers, Joseph)
June 14, 2011 Filing 94 Minute Entry for Final Pretrial Conference held on 6/14/2011 before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. Plaintiff's counsel will submit an amended witness list and an amended exhibit list on or before June 21, 2011. The Final Pretrial Order will not be entered until the amended lists are submitted.(Court Reporter: FTR - Nick Richards)(kmtcd)
June 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 93 MINUTE ORDER granting #85 Motion for Leave to Exceed the Court's Page Limit in its Reply in Support of its Motion for Summary Judgment. The Reply Brief filed June 7, 2011 is accepted for filing. Entered by Chief Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 6/14/11. (wydcd, rrk)
June 13, 2011 Filing 92 Utility Setting/Resetting Deadlines/Hearings: Proposed Pretrial Order terminated as filed. TEXT ONLY ENTRY - NO DOCUMENT ATTACHED (jjh, )
June 10, 2011 Filing 91 Proposed Pretrial Order by Plaintiff Celeste Doyle. (Rogers, Joseph)
June 10, 2011 Filing 90 Utility Setting/Resetting Deadlines/Hearings: Proposed Pretrial Order due by 6/10/2011. Pursuant to the Minute Order of 06/10/11 TEXT ONLY ENTRY - NO DOCUMENT ATTACHED (jjh, )
June 10, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 89 MINUTE ORDER granting #87 Motion for 1-Day Extension of Time to File Proposed Final Pretrial Order. The proposed Final Pretrial Order shall be filed no later than 5:00 p.m. on June 10, 2011. By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 6/10/11.TEXT ONLY ENTRY - NO DOCUMENT ATTACHED (kmtlc1 )
June 10, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 88 MEMORANDUM regarding #87 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Proposed Pretrial Order (1-Day) filed by Celeste Doyle. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya by Chief Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 6/10/11. TEXT ONLY ENTRY - NO DOCUMENT ATTACHED (wydcd, rrk)
June 9, 2011 Filing 87 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Proposed Pretrial Order (1-Day) by Plaintiff Celeste Doyle. (Rogers, Joseph)
June 7, 2011 Filing 86 REPLY to Response to #68 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Defendant Denver Department of Human Services. (Attachments: #1 Defendant's Exhibit J, #2 Defendant's Exhibit K, #3 Defendant's Exhibit L, #4 Defendant's Exhibit M, #5 Defendant's Exhibit N, #6 Defendant's Exhibit O, #7 Defendant's Exhibit P, #8 Defendant's Exhibit Q)(Davison, Linda)
June 7, 2011 Filing 85 MOTION for Leave to exceed the Court's page limit by Defendant Denver Department of Human Services. (Davison, Linda)
May 31, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 84 MINUTE ORDER granting #83 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Defendant shall file a reply to #68 Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment on or before Thursday, June 9, 2011. Entered by Chief Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 5/31/11. (wydcd, rrk) Modified on 6/1/2011 to correct spelling error (jjh, ).
May 27, 2011 Filing 83 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #68 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Defendant Denver Department of Human Services. (Davison, Linda)
May 23, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 82 MINUTE ORDER Plaintiffs Motion for Permission to File Response to Defendants Motion forSummary Judgment of 8 Pages Greater Length filed in duplicate on May 18, 2011 #79 and #80 is GRANTED by Chief Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 05/23/11.(jjhsl, )
May 19, 2011 Filing 81 REPLY to Response to #70 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Revised) filed by Plaintiff Celeste Doyle. (Rogers, Joseph)
May 19, 2011 Filing 80 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages In Response to Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment (Format Corrected) by Plaintiff Celeste Doyle. (Rogers, Joseph)
May 18, 2011 Filing 79 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages In Response to Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment by Plaintiff Celeste Doyle. (Rogers, Joseph)
May 18, 2011 Filing 78 RESPONSE to #68 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Plaintiff Celeste Doyle. (Rogers, Joseph)
May 13, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 77 MINUTE ORDER granting #76 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment and Reply to Defendant's Response to Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment. Entered by Chief Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 5/13/11. (wydcd, rrk)
May 10, 2011 Filing 76 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #68 MOTION for Summary Judgment, #70 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Revised) by Plaintiff Celeste Doyle. (Rogers, Joseph)
April 26, 2011 Filing 75 RESPONSE to #70 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Revised) filed by Defendant Denver Department of Human Services. (Attachments: #1 Deposition Excerpts exhibit 1, #2 Deposition Excerpts exhibit 2)(Davison, Linda)
April 22, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 74 MINUTE ORDER granting #69 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. See Minute Order for details by Chief Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 04/22/11.(jjh, )
April 21, 2011 Filing 73 REPLY to Response to #69 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages In Her Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Plaintiff Celeste Doyle. (Rogers, Joseph)
April 20, 2011 Filing 72 RESPONSE to #69 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages In Her Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Defendant Denver Department of Human Services. (Davison, Linda)
April 19, 2011 Filing 71 Exhibits in Support of #70 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Revised) by Plaintiff Celeste Doyle. (Rogers, Joseph)
April 19, 2011 Filing 70 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Revised) by Plaintiff Celeste Doyle. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Rogers, Joseph)
April 19, 2011 Filing 69 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages In Her Motion for Summary Judgment by Plaintiff Celeste Doyle. (Rogers, Joseph)
April 19, 2011 Filing 68 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Defendant Denver Department of Human Services. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, job confirmation letter, #2 Exhibit B, affidavit Tamara Dixon, #3 Exhibit C, affidavit Jason McRoy, #4 Exhibit D, EEO-4 record, #5 Exhibit E, investigation report, #6 Exhibit F, deposition, Valerie Brooks, #7 Exhibit G, deposition, Plaintiff, #8 Exhibit H, email 8/02/06, #9 Exhibit I, termination letter)(Davison, Linda)
April 19, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 67 MINUTE ORDER striking #64 Motion for Summary Judgment by Chief Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 04/19/11.(jjh, )
April 19, 2011 Filing 65 Exhibits in Support of #64 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Plaintiff Celeste Doyle. (Rogers, Joseph)
April 18, 2011 Filing 64 STRICKEN MOTION for Summary Judgment by Plaintiff Celeste Doyle. (Rogers, Joseph) Modified on 4/19/2011 striking pursuant to the Minute Order of 04/19/11 (jjh, ).
April 15, 2011 Filing 66 Minute Entry for Motion Hearing held on 4/15/2011 before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya, denying #57 Motion to Compel. (Court Reporter: FTR - Nick Richards) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (kmtcd)
April 13, 2011 Filing 63 Exhibits in Support of #61 Reply to Response to Motion to Compel Regarding Email Communications and Request for Expidited Ruling by Plaintiff Celeste Doyle. (Rogers, Joseph)
April 13, 2011 Filing 62 Exhibits in Support of #61 Reply to Response to Motion Compel Regarding Email Communications and Request for Expidited Ruling by Plaintiff Celeste Doyle. (Rogers, Joseph)
April 13, 2011 Filing 61 REPLY to Response to #57 MOTION to Compel Regarding Defendant's Email Communications and Request for Expidited Ruling filed by Plaintiff Celeste Doyle. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Rogers, Joseph)
April 7, 2011 Filing 60 RESPONSE to #57 MOTION to Compel Regarding Defendant's Email Communications and Request for Expidited Ruling filed by Defendant Denver Department of Human Services. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit exhibit 2, #3 Deposition Excerpts exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit exhibit 4)(Davison, Linda)
March 29, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 59 MINUTE ORDER Setting Hearing on #57 Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Regarding Defendant's Email Communications and Request for Expedited Ruling. Defendant shall respond no later than April 7, 2011. Plaintiff shall reply no later than April 13, 2011. Motion Hearing set for 4/15/2011 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom C201 before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 3/29/2011. TEXT ONLY ENTRY - NO DOCUMENT ATTACHED(kmtlc2)
March 29, 2011 Filing 58 MEMORANDUM regarding #57 MOTION to Compel Regarding Defendant's Email Communications and Request for Expidited Ruling filed by Celeste Doyle. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya by Chief Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 3/29/11. TEXT ONLY ENTRY - NO DOCUMENT ATTACHED (wydcd, rrk)
March 28, 2011 Filing 57 MOTION to Compel Regarding Defendant's Email Communications and Request for Expidited Ruling by Plaintiff Celeste Doyle. (Rogers, Joseph)
March 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 56 MINUTE ORDER: The Final Pretrial Conference set for 6/16/2011 is VACATED and RESET to 6/14/2011 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom C201 before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 3/7/11. TEXT ONLY ENTRY - NO DOCUMENT ATTACHED(kmtlc1 )
February 25, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER. Defendant's Verified Motion for a Protective Order is granted in part and denied in part #48 . See Order for details. Ordered that the Motion hearing set for 03/07/11 at 9:00 a.m. is VACATED by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 02/25/11.(jjh, )
January 27, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER granting #51 Plaintiffs Motion to Compel and Request for Expedited Ruling. Discovery due by 4/1/2011. Dispositive Motions due by 5/2/2011. Final Pretrial Conference set for 6/16/2011 09:30 AM in Courtroom C201 before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 1/27/2011.(erv, )
January 24, 2011 Filing 53 RESPONSE to #51 First MOTION to Compel and Request for Expedited Ruling filed by Defendant Denver Department of Human Services. (Attachments: #1 exhibit A)(Davison, Linda)
January 21, 2011 Filing 52 MEMORANDUM regarding #51 First MOTION to Compel and Request for Expedited Ruling filed by Celeste Doyle. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya by Chief Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 1/21/11. TEXT ONLY ENTRY - NO DOCUMENT ATTACHED (wydcd, rrk)
January 21, 2011 Filing 51 First MOTION to Compel and Request for Expedited Ruling by Plaintiff Celeste Doyle. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Court's Scheduling Order dated 3/30/2010)(Rogers, Joseph)
January 10, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 50 MINUTE ORDER Setting Hearing on Motion: Motion Hearing set for 3/7/2011 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom C201 before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya regarding #48 MOTION for Protective Order. By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 1/10/11. TEXT ONLY ENTRY - NO DOCUMENT ATTACHED(kmtlc1 )
January 10, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 49 MEMORANDUM regarding #48 MOTION for Protective Order filed by Denver Department of Human Services. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya by Chief Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 1/10/11. TEXT ONLY ENTRY - NO DOCUMENT ATTACHED (wydcd, rrk)
January 10, 2011 Filing 48 MOTION for Protective Order by Defendant Denver Department of Human Services. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit exhibit 3)(Davison, Linda)
January 5, 2011 Filing 47 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Niels Loechell on behalf of Denver Department of Human Services (Loechell, Niels)
December 20, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 46 MINUTE ORDER granting #44 Motion for Extension of Discovery Cut-Off. The discovery cutoff is extended to 1/31/2011. Additionally, the dispositive motions deadline is extended to 3/1/2011. The Final Pretrial Conference set for 3/22/2011 is VACATED and RESET to 5/3/2011 at 9:30 AM in Courtroom C201 before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 12/20/10.TEXT ONLY ENTRY - NO DOCUMENT ATTACHED (kmtlc1 )
December 20, 2010 Filing 45 MEMORANDUM regarding #44 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Conclude Discovery filed by Celeste Doyle. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya by Chief Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 12/20/10. TEXT ONLY ENTRY - NO DOCUMENT ATTACHED (wydcd, rrk)
December 17, 2010 Filing 44 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Conclude Discovery by Plaintiff Celeste Doyle. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only) Proposed Order On Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Discovery Cut-Off)(Rogers, Joseph)
December 16, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER granting #6 Motion to Dismiss Party. Party City and County of Denver is DISMISSED from the case and shall hereafter be taken off the caption. by Chief Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 12/16/2010.(erv, )
December 3, 2010 Filing 42 Docket Annotation re: #41 Status Conference, This entry is NOT a part of this case. It was docketed in this case in error. TEXT ONLY ENTRY - NO DOCUMENT ATTACHED (erv2, ) (Modified on 12/6/2010 corrected typing error)(erv, ).
December 2, 2010 Filing 41 Minute Entry for Status Conference held on 12/2/2010 before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. On or before December 9, 2010, Defense counsel will file a statement compliant with the Rules of Professional Conduct, Advisory Opinion 120, identifying every employee believed to have entered into an individual representation agreement with the law firm concerning the matters at issue in this case, together with all facts supporting that such an attorney-client relationship exists with the individual employee. Plaintiff will have until December 16, 2010 to respond to the statement. Defense counsel may respond to the Plaintiff's submission on or before December 23, 2010. For further information, please see the attached minutes. (Court Reporter: FTR - Nick Richards) (kmtcd)
December 2, 2010 Filing 40 Minute Entry for Discovery Hearing held on 12/2/2010 before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. Due to significant delays in the deposition of Ms. Celeste Doyle, the deposition will be set for a certain day during the week beginning December 6, 2010. Attorney Linda Davison will be allowed the full 7 hours to conduct the deposition. (Court Reporter: FTR - Nick Richards) (kmtcd)
December 1, 2010 Filing 39 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Joseph B. Rogers on behalf of Celeste Doyle (erv, )
December 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 38 MINUTE ORDER A telephonic discovery hearing will be held on December 2, 2010, at 9:00 a.m. To attend the hearing, the parties shall place a conference call to chambers, 303-335-2780, at the scheduled time, by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 12/1/2010. (erv, )
November 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 37 MINUTE ORDER: The Final Pretrial Conference set for 03/15/2011 is VACATED and RESET to 3/22/2011 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom C201 before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. The proposed Final Pretrial Order shall be filed no later than 3/15/2011. By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 11/8/10. TEXT ONLY ENTRY - NO DOCUMENT ATTACHED(kmtlc1 )
September 13, 2010 Filing 36 Minute Entry for Show Cause Hearing held on 9/13/2010 before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. Discovery due by 12/31/2010. Final Pretrial Conference set for 3/15/2011 09:30 AM in Courtroom C201 before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. It is ORDERED: Order to Show Cause #33 is DISCHARGED. (Court Reporter FTR - Nick Richards) (kmtcd) (Modified on 9/17/2010 added text that the Order to Show Cause was discharged)(erv, ).
August 18, 2010 Filing 35 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. Granting #25 Motion to Compel. Granting #28 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney N. Nora Nye terminated. Motion Hearing held on 8/18/2010. (Court Reporter FTR - Nick Richards) (kmtcd)
August 18, 2010 Filing 34 CERTIFICATE of Service by mail by Clerk of Court re #33 Order to Show Cause, to Celeste Doyle at 876 W. Govan, Apt. 66, Grenada, MS 38901. TEXT ONLY ENTRY - NO DOCUMENT ATTACHED (erv, )
August 18, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: returnable by Plaintiff Celeste Doyle why the Complaint should not be dismissed for failure to for Failure to comply with discovery, the Local Rules of Practice for the United States District Court for the District of Colorado, and the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and for failure to appear as Ordered at the August 18, 2010 Motions hearing. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(b). Show Cause Hearing set for 9/13/2010 09:30 AM in Courtroom C201 before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. The Clerk of Court shall send a copy of this Order to Show Cause to the Plaintiff, Celeste Doyle at 876 W. Govan, Apt. 66, Grenada, MS 38901 and file a Certificate of Service. by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 8/18/2010. (erv, )
July 20, 2010 Filing 32 RESPONSE to #25 MOTION to Compel discovery filed by Plaintiff Celeste Doyle. (Nye, N.)
July 12, 2010 Filing 31 CERTIFICATE of Service by Mail by Clerk of Court re #30 Order Setting Hearing on Motion, to Celeste Doyle, 876 W. Govan, Apt. 66, Grenada, MS. TEXT ONLY ENTRY - NO DOCUMENT ATTACHED (erv, )
July 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 30 MINUTE ORDER Setting Hearing on Motion #28 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney : Motion Hearing set for 8/18/2010 10:00 AM in Courtroom C201 before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. Plaintiff and her counsel shall appear at the motion hearing. The Clerk of Court is directed to send a copy of this Minute Order to Plaintiff at the following address: Celeste Doyle, 876 W. Govan, Apt. 66, Grenada, MS 38901. by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 7/12/2010. (erv, )
July 2, 2010 Filing 29 MEMORANDUM regarding #28 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney filed by Celeste Doyle. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya by Chief Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 7/2/10. TEXT ONLY ENTRY - NO DOCUMENT ATTACHED (wydcd, rrk)
July 2, 2010 Filing 28 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Plaintiff Celeste Doyle. (Attachments: #1 Notification Certificate)(Nye, N.)
June 30, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 27 MINUTE ORDER Setting Hearing on Motion: Motion Hearing set for 8/18/2010 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom C201 before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya regarding #25 MOTION to Compel Dscovery. By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 6/30/10. TEXT ONLY ENTRY - NO DOCUMENT ATTACHED(kmtlc1 )
June 29, 2010 Filing 26 MEMORANDUM regarding #25 MOTION to Compel discovery filed by City and County of Denver, Denver Department of Human Services. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya by Chief Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 6/29/10. TEXT ONLY ENTRY - NO DOCUMENT ATTACHED (wydcd, rrk)
June 29, 2010 Filing 25 MOTION to Compel discovery by Defendants City and County of Denver, Denver Department of Human Services. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit interrogatories)(Davison, Linda)
June 29, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 24 MINUTE ORDER denying without prejudice #22 Defendants' Motion to Compel Discovery, for Defendants' failure to comply with D.C.COLO.LCivR 37.1. By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 6/29/10.TEXT ONLY ENTRY - NO DOCUMENT ATTACHED (kmtlc1)
June 29, 2010 Filing 23 MEMORANDUM regarding #22 MOTION to Compel Discovery filed by City and County of Denver, Denver Department of Human Services. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya by Chief Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 6/29/10. TEXT ONLY ENTRY - NO DOCUMENT ATTACHED (wydcd, rrk)
June 29, 2010 Filing 22 MOTION to Compel Discovery by Defendants City and County of Denver, Denver Department of Human Services. (Davison, Linda)
June 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting #5 Defendant Denver Department of Human Services Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs 42 U.S.C. 1981 Claim. Plaintiffs Title VII claims against DHHS, however, remain pending. by Chief Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 6/15/2010.(erv, )
April 13, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 20 MINUTE ORDER granting #18 Motion to Vacate Settlement Conference. The settlement conference set for April 14, 2010 is VACATED. The parties shall contact the court at a later date if and when a settlement conference is desired. By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 4/13/10.TEXT ONLY ENTRY - NO DOCUMENT ATTACHED (kmtlc1 )
April 13, 2010 Filing 19 MEMORANDUM regarding #18 MOTION to Vacate Settlement Conference filed by Celeste Doyle. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya by Chief Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 4/13/10. TEXT ONLY ENTRY - NO DOCUMENT ATTACHED (wydcd, rrk)
April 13, 2010 Filing 18 MOTION to Vacate Settlement Conference by Plaintiff Celeste Doyle. (Nye, N.)
April 7, 2010 Filing 17 RESPONSE to #6 MOTION to Dismiss Party City & County of Denver filed by Plaintiff Celeste Doyle. (Nye, N.)
March 30, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER SETTING SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE: Settlement Conference set for 4/14/2010 01:30 PM in Courtroom C201 before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 3/30/2010. (kmtcd, )
March 30, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 15 SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 3/30/2010. (kmtcd, )
March 30, 2010 Filing 14 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya: Scheduling Conference held on 3/30/2010. Discovery due by 9/30/2010. Dispositive Motions due by 10/30/2010. Plaintiffs request for stay of proceedings pending a settlement conference is DENIED.Settlement Conference set for 4/14/2010 01:30 PM in Courtroom C201 before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. Final Pretrial Conference set for 1/4/2011 09:15 AM in Courtroom C201 before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. (FTR - Debra Brown) (kmtcd, )
March 23, 2010 Filing 13 Proposed Scheduling Order by Plaintiff Celeste Doyle. (Nye, N.)
March 18, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MINUTE ORDER denying #10 Motion to Reschedule the Scheduling Conference. Due to other conflicting settings, Magistrate Judge Tafoya is unavailable on April 6, 2010. Plaintiff's counsel may appear by telephone at the Scheduling Conference on March 30, 2010, by calling 303-335-2780 at the scheduled time. By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 3/18/10.TEXT ONLY ENTRY - NO DOCUMENT ATTACHED (kmtlc1)
March 18, 2010 Filing 11 MEMORANDUM regarding #10 Unopposed MOTION to Reset Scheduling Conference filed by Celeste Doyle. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya by Chief Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 3/18/10. TEXT ONLY ENTRY - NO DOCUMENT ATTACHED (wydcd, rrk)
March 18, 2010 Filing 10 Unopposed MOTION to Reset Scheduling Conference by Plaintiff Celeste Doyle. (Nye, N.)
March 18, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MINUTE ORDER denying #7 Motion to Reset Scheduling Conference. The Scheduling Conference set before Magistrate Judge Tafoya is set to last fifteen minutes. As such, Defendants' counsel will have more than ample time to attend the Scheduling Conference in this case and then to proceed next door to Magistrate Judge Hegarty's courtroom for the 9:30 a.m. Scheduling Conference. by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 3/18/10.TEXT ONLY ENTRY - NO DOCUMENT ATTACHED (kmtlc1)
March 18, 2010 Filing 8 MEMORANDUM regarding #7 MOTION to Reset scheduling conference filed by Denver Department of Human Services. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya by Chief Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 3/18/10. TEXT ONLY ENTRY - NO DOCUMENT ATTACHED (wydcd, rrk)
March 18, 2010 Filing 7 MOTION to Reset scheduling conference by Defendant Denver Department of Human Services. (Davison, Linda)
March 17, 2010 Filing 6 MOTION to Dismiss Party by Defendant City and County of Denver. (Davison, Linda)
March 17, 2010 Filing 5 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Defendant Denver Department of Human Services. (Davison, Linda)
March 17, 2010 Filing 4 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Denver Department of Human Services.(Davison, Linda) (Modified on 3/18/2010 added link to complaint)(erv, ).
January 6, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER SETTING RULE 16(b) SCHEDULING CONFERENCE AND RULE 26(f) PLANNING MEETING: Scheduling Conference set for 3/30/2010 09:00 AM in Courtroom C201 before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 1/6/2010. (kmtcd, )
January 6, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya by Chief Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 1/6/10. (wydcd, rrk)
December 31, 2009 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and Jury Demand against City and County of Denver, Denver Department of Human Services ( Filing fee $ 350, Receipt Number 24672) Summons Issued, filed by Celeste Doyle. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Receipt)(jak, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Doyle v. Denver Department of Human Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Celeste Doyle
Represented By: Joseph Bernard Rogers
Represented By: N. Nora Nye
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City and County of Denver
Represented By: Linda Marie Davison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Denver Department of Human Services
Represented By: Linda Marie Davison
Represented By: Niels Loechell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?