Internal Revenue Service v. All monies up to $750,000
Petitioner: Internal Revenue Service
Respondent: All monies up to $750,000
Case Number: 1:2009mc00030
Filed: May 6, 2009
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
Presiding Judge: NONE
Presiding Judge: Michael J. Watanabe
Nature of Suit: Other

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 23, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER: The Claimants pending motions are now moot and the case is dismissed, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 10/23/09.(jak, )
July 8, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 20 Minute ORDER granting 18 Motion to Vacate ; granting 19 Motion to Vacate. The Petitioner Internal Revenue Service need not file a response to Respondents Watson and Simpsons (1) Request [Motion] for Immediate Release of Seized Property 13 and (2) Request [Motion] for Pardon 14 . as previously directed. by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 7/8/09.(jak, ) Modified on 7/13/2009 to add the word Minute(jak, ).
June 24, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER Regarding Respondents' Motion to Dismiss. This court ORDERS that Respondents' 3 Motion to Dismiss is DENIED, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 6/24/09.(jak, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Internal Revenue Service v. All monies up to $750,000
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Internal Revenue Service
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: All monies up to $750,000
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?