A.N.M.R. et al v. Sonrise Pilot, LLC et al
Plaintiff: C.A.M.R. and A.N.M.R.
Defendant: Sonrise Pilot, LLC, David Hainault and Pac-Van, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2010cv00010
Filed: January 5, 2010
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: XX Outside US
Presiding Judge: Philip A. Brimmer
Presiding Judge: Michael J. Watanabe
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Wrongful Death
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER DISMISSING CASE with prejudice, each party shall pay their own attorneys fees and costs, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 3/27/2012. (rpmcd )
February 2, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 73 RULINGS ON ISSUES PRESENTED IN THE TRIAL BRIEFS re: 70 and 72 . Defendants' renewed motion for summary judgment is denied. The jury will not be instructed on joint and several liability. Thomas Alcorn will be permitted to testify, subject to the limitations described, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 2/2/2012. (rpmcd)
October 25, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER Setting February 6, 2012, at 8:30 a.m Jury Trial Date and January 13, 2012, at 2:00 p.m Trial Preparation Conference, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 10/24/2011. (rpmcd)
October 5, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER Setting Pretrial Conference for 10/24/2011 at 02:00 PM in Conference Room and Proposed Pretrial Order due by 4:00 p.m. 10/20/2011 by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 10/5/2011. (rpmcd)
September 29, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER On Pending Motions. Defendants' motion to compel 55 is granted in part and denied in part. Defendants' motion for summary judgment 56 is denied, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 9/29/2011.(rpmcd)
February 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER Withdrawing Order of Reference by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 02/14/11. (jjh, )
February 9, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER granting 45 Joint Motion to Vacate Pre-Trial Conference, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 2/9/11.(mnf, )
July 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER Granting Stipulated Motion to Consolidate. Civil Action No. 10-cv-00010- PAB-MJW is consolidated into 09-cv-03031-RPM for discovery only. The joint settlement conference scheduled with Magistrate Judge Watanabe in Civil Action No. 10-cv-00010-PAB-MJW on 08/16/10 is vacated by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 07/08/10. (jjh, )
March 4, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 23 MINUTE ORDER granting 21 Stipulated Motion to Reconsider Order 20 Denying Motion to Reschedule the Schedulng/Planning Conference. Scheduling Conference 3/15/2010 09:00 a.m. is vacated. Scheduling Conference reset for 3/19/2010 09:00 AM in Courtroom A 502 before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe. Parties shall file proposed scheduling order by 3/12/2010, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 3/4/2010.(mjwcd)
January 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 3/15/2010 09:00 AM in Courtroom A 502 before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 1/15/2010. (mjwcd )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: A.N.M.R. et al v. Sonrise Pilot, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sonrise Pilot, LLC
Represented By: Rick N. Haderlie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Hainault
Represented By: Rick N. Haderlie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pac-Van, Inc.
Represented By: Douglas Adam Stevens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: C.A.M.R.
Represented By: David L. Lenyo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: A.N.M.R.
Represented By: David L. Lenyo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?