Harris v. Trani et al
Plaintiff: Jennifer D. Harris
Defendant: Travis Trani, Ramona Avant and Tonya Gamblin
Case Number: 1:2010cv00027
Filed: January 7, 2010
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Denver
Presiding Judge: Zita L. Weinshienk
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 29, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ORDER. The 78 Recommendation of United States Magistrate Judge is accepted. Defendants' 44 motion to dismiss is granted and this case is dismissed without prejudice in its entirety. By Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 3/29/12.(mnfsl, )
January 24, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER re: Service by United States Marshal, by Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 1/21/11.(mnf, )
November 29, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER to Dismiss in Part and to Draw Case to A District Judge and Magistrate Judge. The complaint is dismissed in part and drawn in part. The claims asserted against Defendants Major Chavez and Lieutenant Cowens in claims three and four are dismisse d as legally frivolous pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915 (e)(2)(B). Because the third and fourth claims are the only claims in which Major Chavez is mentioned as a Defendant, he will be dismissed as a party to this action. The clerk of the Court is directed to remove the name of Major Chavez from this action. The remaining claims asserted against the remaining Defendants and the case are drawn to a distrit judge and a magistrate judge. By Judge Christine M. Arguello for Judge Zita L. Weinshienk on 11/23/2010. (sah, )
November 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 31 Minute ORDER denying as unnecessary 30 Motion for non payment of filing fees by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 11/12/10.(jjh, )
July 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER to File Second and Final Amended Complaint within 30 days by Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer on 06/30/10. (jjh, )
May 4, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER Directing Plaintiff to File Amended Complaint within 30 days by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 05/04/10. (jjh, )
March 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER Granting Leave to Proceed Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915 by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 03/15/10. (jjh, )
March 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER Granting Motion to Reconsider and Reinstating Case. Ordered that the document titled "Clerk Error" 7 is construed liberally as a Fed.R.Civ.P.59(e) motion and is granted. Ordered that the dismissal and judgment are vacated. Ordered that the clerk of the Court is directed to reinstate and return this action to the pro se docket. Ordered that Mr. Harris will be granted leave to proceed by a seperate order by Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 03/11/10. (jjh, )
January 7, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER Directing Clerk to Commence Civil Action and Directing Plaintiff to Cure Deficiency. Plaintiff shall have 30 days to file a certified copy of prisoner's trust fund statement, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 1/5/10. (jak, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Harris v. Trani et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer D. Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Travis Trani
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ramona Avant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tonya Gamblin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?