Crabbe v. Davis
Petitioner: William C. Crabbe
Respondent: B. Davis
Case Number: 1:2010cv00050
Filed: January 11, 2010
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Fremont
Presiding Judge: Boyd N. Boland
Presiding Judge: Michael E. Hegarty
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2241 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (federa
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 3, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER. The magistrate judges Recommendation on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus Pursuant To 28 U.S.C. § 2241 16 filed 07/29/2010, is APPROVED. The objections stated in applicants Objection To Recommendation onApplication for Writ of Habe as Corpus 17 filed 07/22/2010, are OVERRULED andDENIED. The applicants Application for a Writ of Habeas Corpus Pursuant To28 U.S.C. § 2241 1 filed 01/11/2009, is DENIED. The respondents are AWARDED their costs. This case is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 11/03/2010.(sah, )
July 27, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 18 MINUTE ORDER denying as moot 14 Petitioner's Motion for Ruling, by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 7/27/2010. (mehcd)
February 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER Drawing Case. This case shall be drawn to a district judge and to a magistrate judge. By Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 02/02/2010. (sah, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Crabbe v. Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: William C. Crabbe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: B. Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?