Rosenfield v. HSBC Bank, USA et al
Plaintiff: |
Jean C. Rosenfield |
Defendant: |
HSBC Bank, USA and Stephanie Y. O'Malley |
Case Number: |
1:2010cv00058 |
Filed: |
January 12, 2010 |
Court: |
US District Court for the District of Colorado |
Office: |
Denver Office |
County: |
Denver |
Presiding Judge: |
Michael E. Hegarty |
Presiding Judge: |
Marcia S. Krieger |
Nature of Suit: |
Truth in Lending |
Cause of Action: |
15 U.S.C. ยง 1601 Truth in Lending |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
August 31, 2010 |
Filing
65
OPINION AND ORDER GRANTING 23 MOTION TO DISMISS. HSBC Bank, USAs 23 Motion to Dismiss is GRANTED. The Complaint is DISMISSED in its entirety as to both Defendants. The Clerk of the Court shall enter judgment consistent with this Order and shall close this case, by Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 08/31/2010.(wjc, )
|
May 26, 2010 |
Filing
63
ORDER denying 24 Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction, by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 5/26/2010. (mehcd)
|
March 16, 2010 |
Filing
46
Courtroom Minutes/Minute Order for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty: Motion Hearing held on 3/16/2010; taking under advisement 24 Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Counsel shall file Joint Stipulated Fa cts, as well as separate Statements of Disputed Facts on or before 3/26/2010. Plaintiff shall file a closing brief on or before 3/26/2010. Defendant HSBC shall file its response on or before 4/7/2010. Plaintiff shall file a reply on or before 4/14/2010. (Court Reporter FTR - C. Coomes) (mehcd)
|
February 26, 2010 |
Filing
41
ORDER REGARDING CUSTODY OF EXHIBITS AND DEPOSITIONS USED IN EVIDENTIARY HEARINGS AND TRIALS: Any exhibits and depositions used during evidentiary hearings or trials, counsel for the parties shall retrieve the originals of such exhibits and deposition s from the Court following the evidentiary hearing or trial, and shall retain same for 60 days beyond the later of the time to appeal or conclusion of any appellate proceedings. The Court will retain its copy of the exhibits for the same time period after which the documents will be destroyed. by Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 2/26/10. (mskcd)
|
January 13, 2010 |
Filing
6
ORDER granting in part and denying in part 4 Motion for TRO: Pursuant to C.R.S. s. 38-38-109(1), Defendant HSBC shall immediately supply written notice to the Public Trustee, requesting that the sale scheduled for January 14, 2010 be cotinued. To the extent the Plaintiff requests any other relief, the Court finds that it lacks authority to grant it. The Court will conduct a non-evidentiary hearing on 1/15/2010 at 04:00 PM to address whether an evidentiary preliminary injunction hearing is ne cessary and, if so, to schedule such hearing. The Plaintiff shall effect service of process of the Summons and Complaint (and a copy of this Order) on the Public Trustee at or before 3:00 p.m. MST on Thursday, January 14, 2010 or show cause why such service is impossible. By Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 1/13/10.(msklc2, )
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?