Peterson v. LaCabe et al

Plaintiff: Gray Peterson
Defendant: Alvin (I) LaCabe, Alvin LaCabe, Lawrence Valencia and Peter Weir
Case Number: 1:2010cv00059
Filed: January 12, 2010
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Referring Judge: Michael E. Hegarty
Presiding Judge: Walker D. Miller
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 8, 2011 45 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER. Plaintiff's 17 Motion for Summary Judgment against Defendant LaCabe is denied. Intervenor Attorney Generals 34 Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment is granted. The claims against all parties are dismissed with prejudice. Judgment shall be entered in favor of Defendants and Intervenor and against Plaintiff on all of his claims. Defendants LaCabe and Intervenor Attorney General may have their costs, by Judge Walker D. Miller on 3/8/11.(mnf, )
November 18, 2010 31 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER granting 29 Intervenor's Motion to File Cross-Motion, by Judge Walker D. Miller on 11/18/10.(ebs, )
October 20, 2010 26 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 6 Motion to Dismiss Executive Director Peter Weir and Colorado Attorney General's Request to be Heard. All claims against Defendant Peter Weir shall be dismissed. John W. Suthers, Attorney General for the State of Colorado, is a party to this action as an intervenor. The Attorney General may file a response to Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment against Defendant LaCabe 17 within 30 days of the date of this order. Denying 19 Defendant LaCabe's Cross Motion for Summary Judgment Against Plaintiff, by Judge Walker D. Miller on 10/20/10.(ebs, )
October 19, 2010 25 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER granting 23 Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion to Vacate Pretrial Conference. Then Final Pretrial Conference set for 11/30/2010 is vacated. By Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 10/19/2010. (mehcd)
April 27, 2010 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 14 Defendant Weir's Motion to Stay Discovery. Discovery is stayed as to Defendant Weir only, including Rule 26(a) disclosure obligations, pending resolution of Defendant Weir's Motion to Dismiss. By Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 4/27/2010. (mehcd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Peterson v. LaCabe et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gray Peterson
Represented By: John R. Monroe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alvin (I) LaCabe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alvin LaCabe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lawrence Valencia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peter Weir
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?