Maldonado v. Prudential Insurance Company of America, The

Plaintiff: Kirk F. Maldonado
Defendant: Prudential Insurance Company of America, The
Case Number: 1:2010cv00074
Filed: January 13, 2010
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Douglas
Presiding Judge: Philip A. Brimmer
Presiding Judge: Michael E. Hegarty
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132 E.R.I.S.A.-Employee Benefits
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 2, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER. Defendant's 33 Motion for Summary Judgment, which the Court construes as a motion requesting dismissal pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(1), is denied, by Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 3/2/11.(mnf, )
April 14, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 22 MINUTE ORDER granting 14 Defendant's Motion to Withdraw Request for Jury Demand, in light of the "Stipulation" filed by Plaintiff. Defendant's demand for a jury [Doc. #2 at 7] is hereby withdrawn. By Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 4/14/2010. (mehcd)
April 7, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MINUTE ORDER denying without prejudice 8 Defendant's Motion to Withdraw Request for Jury Demand, by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 4/7/2010. (mehcd)
February 25, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER SETTING HEARING UNDER FED. R. CIV. P. 16: Hearing set for 4/8/2010 02:30 PM in Courtroom A 701 before Judge Philip A. Brimmer, by Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 2/25/10. (ebs, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Maldonado v. Prudential Insurance Company of America, The
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kirk F. Maldonado
Represented By: Michael Scott Krieger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Prudential Insurance Company of America, The
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?