Aldridge v. United States Attorney General et al
Petitioner: James E. Aldridge, Jr.
Respondent: United States Attorney General and Rene Garcia
Case Number: 1:2010cv00187
Filed: January 28, 2010
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Jefferson
Presiding Judge: Boyd N. Boland
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2241 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (federa
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 18, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 33 Minute ORDER denying as moot 31 Motion to Dismiss Respodent's Motion to Authorize Petitioner's Transfer by Judge Zita L. Weinshienk on 11/18/10.(jjh, )
November 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER granting 24 Motion to Authorize Petitioner's Transfer by Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 11/12/10 for Zita Leeson Weinshienk(jjh, )
July 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER to Cure Deficiency re 15 Notice of Appeal by James Aldridge Jr., by Judge Philip A. Brimmer for Senior Judge Zita Leeson Weinshienk on 07/22/10. Appellant has 30 days to either pay the filing fee or file a 1915 motion with district court.(bjrsl, ) Modified on 7/22/2010 to include Judge Weinshienk in the text.(bjrsl, ).
June 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER denying 13 Motion for Reconsideration by Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 06/21/10 for Zita Leeson Weinshienk(jjh, )
April 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Minute ORDER denying 8 Motion for a More Definite Statement Pursuant to Rule 12(e) by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 04/08/10.(jjh, )
March 29, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER that Petitioner's objections 6 are overruled. Ordered that Petitioner shall have 30 days to file a response to the Order to Show Cause by Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 03/29/10. (jjh, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Aldridge v. United States Attorney General et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: James E. Aldridge, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: United States Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Rene Garcia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?