Tobara v. Morrison
Plaintiff: Todd Tobara
Defendant: Morrison
Case Number: 1:2010cv00239
Filed: February 4, 2010
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Chaffee
Presiding Judge:
Presiding Judge: Boyd N. Boland
Presiding Judge: Kathleen M. Tafoya
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER ACCEPTED 15 Report and Recommendations of the United States Magistrate Judge. Granting 13 Defendants Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed. Civ. R. P. 12 (b)(6), or for Summary Judgment; Accordingly, this case is DISMISSED. by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 9/9/2010.(erv, )
April 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER Granting service by the United States Marshal re: 4 Complaint filed by Todd Tobara by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 4/2/2010. (erv, )
February 25, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER Drawing Case. This case shall be drawn to a district judge and to a magistrate judge. By Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 02/25/2010. (sah, )
February 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER Plaintiff may proceed in this action without the payment of an initial partial filing fee. Monthly payments to be made until filing fee is paid in full re: 3 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 2/19/10. (gmssl, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tobara v. Morrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Todd Tobara
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Morrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?